EP0454781 - RECOMBINANT CELLS FOR THERAPIES OF INFECTION AND HYPERPROLIFERATIVE DISORDERS AND PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/45] | RECOMBINANT THERAPIES FOR INFECTION AND HYPERPROLIFERATIVE DISORDERS | ||
[1998/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHIRON CORPORATION 4560 Horton Street Emeryville CA 94608-2916 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/45] | For all designated states CHIRON CORPORATION 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, California 94608 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLDSMITH, Mark, A. 20 Maple Street West Roxbury, MA 02132 / US | 02 /
RALSTON, Robert, O. 2836 Judah San Francisco, CA 94122 / US | [1991/45] | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/45] | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 90902891.2 | 22.01.1990 | [1991/45] | WO1990US00445 | Priority number, date | US19890300637 | 23.01.1989 Original published format: US 300637 | US19900461461 | 17.01.1990 Original published format: US 461461 | [1991/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9007936 | Date: | 26.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0454781 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0454781 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.07.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/12, C07H15/12, C12N15/00, C12N5/00, C12N7/00 | [1991/45] | CPC: |
A61K31/70 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12N15/85 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/45] | Title | German: | REKOMBINANTE ZELLEN FÜR THERAPIEN VON INFEKTIONEN UND HYPERPROLIEFERATIVE STÖRUNGEN UND DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [1998/51] | English: | RECOMBINANT CELLS FOR THERAPIES OF INFECTION AND HYPERPROLIFERATIVE DISORDERS AND PREPARATION THEREOF | [1998/51] | French: | CELLULES DE RECOMBINAISON POUR DES THERAPIES D'INFECTIONS ET DE TROUBLES HYPERPROLIFERATIFS ET LA PREPARATION DE CES CELLULES | [1998/51] |
Former [1991/45] | REKOMBINANTTHERAPIEN FÜR INFEKTIONEN UND HYPERPROLIFERATIVE STÖRUNGEN | ||
Former [1991/45] | RECOMBINANT THERAPIES FOR INFECTION AND HYPERPROLIFERATIVE DISORDERS | ||
Former [1991/45] | THERAPIES DE RECOMBINAISON POUR INFECTIONS ET TROUBLES HYPERPROLIFERATIFS | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/44: Teilanmeldung 97113730.2 eingereicht am 08/08/97 | EPB 1997/44: Divisional application 97113730.2 filed on 08/08/97 | EPB 1997/44: Demande divisionnaire 97113730.2 déposée le 08/08/97 | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.1991 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.1991 | Search fee paid | 09.08.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No | 10.07.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 09.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/45] | 12.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 30.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 25.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97113730.2 / EP0832980 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/49] | Request for further processing for: | 30.11.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 30.11.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.12.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.12.1998 | BE | 16.12.1998 | ES | 16.12.1998 | LU | 22.01.1999 | DK | 16.03.1999 | SE | 16.03.1999 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 16.12.1998 | |
BE | 16.12.1998 | ||
ES | 16.12.1998 | ||
DK | 16.03.1999 | ||
SE | 16.03.1999 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 16.12.1998 | |
BE | 16.12.1998 | ||
ES | 16.12.1998 | ||
SE | 16.03.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 16.12.1998 | |
BE | 16.12.1998 | ||
SE | 16.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/34] | AT | 16.12.1998 | |
BE | 16.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 16.12.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO9011359 (WHITEHEAD BIOMEDICAL INST [US]); | [E]WO9102805 (VIAGENE INC [US]); | [E]EP0415731 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]); | [XP]EP0334301 (VIAGENE INC [US]) | International search | [Y]EP0288163 (US HEALTH [US]); | [Y]US4738922 (HASELTINE WILLIAM A [US], et al) | [Y] - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, Volume 85, published March 1988. J. PIERCE, et al. "Oligonucleotide that binds nuclear factor NF-Kappa beta acts as a lymphoid-specific and inducible enhancer element " pp. 1482-1486. see entire article. | [Y] - Science, Volume 231, published 11 January 1985. J. SODROSKI, et al. "Trans-activating transcriptional regulation of human T-cell leukemia virus type III long terminal repeat" pp. 171-173. see entire article. | [Y] - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, Volume 84, published August 1987. J. Yee, et al. "Gene expression from transcriptionally disabled retroviral vectors" pp. 5197-5021. see entire article. | [Y] - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, Volume 83, published May 1986. S. YU, et al. "Self-inactivating retroviral vectors designed for transfer of whole genes into mammalian cells" pp. 3194-3198. see entire article. | [Y] - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, Volume 85, published April 1988. R. PATARCA, et al. "rpt-1, an intracellular protein from helper/inducer T cells that regulates gene expression of interleukin 2 receptor and human immunodeficiency virus type 1" pp. 2733-2737. see entire article. | [Y] - Nature, Volume 334, published 21 July 1988, V WALBOT et al. "Plant development and ribozymes for pathogens" pp. 196-197. see entire article. | [Y] - Cell, Volume 80, published 31 July 1987, R. PALMITER et al. "Cell lineage ablation in transgenic mice by cellspecific expression of a toxin gene" pp. 435-443. see entire article. | [Y] - Mol. and Cell. Biol. Volume 6, published August 1988, A. MILLER et al. "Redesign of retrovirus packaging cell lines to avoid recombination leading to helper virus production" pp. 2895-2902. see entire article. | [Y] - Nature, Volume 325, published 26 February 1987, H. MITSUYA et al. "Strategies for antiviral therapy in AIDS" pp. 773-778. see entire article. | [Y] - J. of Infect. Dis., Volume 157, published March 1988, M. HIRSCH, "Azidothymidine" pp. 427-431. see entire article. | [Y] - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, Volume 85, published September 1988, A. FRANKEL et al. "Dimerization of the tat protein from human immunodeficiency virus: a cysteine-rich peptide mimics the normal metallinked dimer interface" pp. 6297-6300. see entire article. | [Y] - Science, Volume 239, published 1988, B. FELBER et al, "A quantitative bioassay based on trans-activation" pp. 184-187. see entire article. | [Y] - Cell, Volume 44, published 28 March 1988, A. DAYTON et al. "The trans-activator gene of the human T cell lymphotropic virus type III is required for replication" pp. 941-947. see entire article. | [Y] - Mol. and Cell. Biol. Volume 7, published February 1987, R. CONE et al. "Regulated expression of a complete human beta-globin gene encoded by a transmissible retrovirus vector" pp. 887-897. see entire article. | [Y] - Nature, Volume 335, published 29 September 1988, D. BALTIMORE, "Intracellular immunization" pp. 395-396. see entire article. | [Y] - Nature, Volume 335, published 29 September 1988 A. FRIEDMAN, et al. "Expression of a truncated viral trans-activator selectively impedes lytic infection by its cognate virus" pp. 452-454 see entire article. | [Y] - Nature, Volume 336, published 24 November 1988. S.L. MANSOUR, et al. "Disruption of the proto-oncogene int-2 in mouse embryo-derived stem cells: a general strategy for targeting mutations to non-selectable genes. pp. 348-352. see entire article. | [Y] - Cell, Volume 48, published 27 February 1987. M. MUESING, et al. "Regulation of mRNA accumulation by a human immunodeficiency virus trans-activator protein" pp 691-701. see entire article. |