EP0423350 - ACRYLIC FIBER OF HIGH THERMAL RESISTANCE, USE OF SAME AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.1998 [1998/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEBO LTD. 17-4, Sumida 5 chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131-0031 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | For all designated states KANEBO LTD. 17-4, Sumida 5 chome Sumida-ku, Tokyo 131 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Toshihiro 5-2, Katsuma 2-chome Hofu-shi, Yamaguchi 747 / JP | 02 /
NAKAYAMA, Yasuaki 6-8-303, Kanebo-cho Hofu-shi, Yamaguchi 747 / JP | 03 /
SASAKI, Minoru 6-8-108, Kanebo-cho Hofu-shi, Yamaguchi 747 / JP | 04 /
ARAI, Kenzi Ko-371-5, Minaminagai-cho Nara-shi, Nara 630 / JP | 05 /
MIHASHI, Yu 23-7, Kibogaoka 4-chome, Konan-cho Koga-gun, Shiga-ken 520-33 / JP | [1991/17] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/17] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90903406.8 | 27.02.1990 | [1991/17] | WO1990JP00234 | Priority number, date | JP19890050119 | 03.03.1989 Original published format: JP 5011989 | JP19890112137 | 02.05.1989 Original published format: JP 11213789 | JP19890282872 | 01.11.1989 Original published format: JP 28287289 | JP19890306437 | 28.11.1989 Original published format: JP 30643789 | JP19890332598 | 25.12.1989 Original published format: JP 33259889 | JP19900010686 | 22.01.1990 Original published format: JP 1068690 | [1991/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9010100 | Date: | 07.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0423350 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.09.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/38, D03D15/00, D04B1/16, H05B3/34 | [1991/17] | CPC: |
D01F6/18 (EP);
D03D15/283 (EP,US);
D01F6/38 (EP);
D03D15/50 (EP,US);
D03D15/513 (EP,US);
D03D15/547 (EP,US);
D03D15/573 (EP,US);
D04B1/16 (EP);
H05B3/34 (EP);
D10B2321/08 (EP);
D10B2501/00 (EP);
D10B2503/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/17] | Title | German: | ACRYLFASER MIT HOHER THERMISCHER BESTÄNDIGKEIT, GEBRAUCH UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN DERSELBEN | [1991/17] | English: | ACRYLIC FIBER OF HIGH THERMAL RESISTANCE, USE OF SAME AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME | [1991/17] | French: | FIBRE ACRYLIQUE A HAUTE RESISTANCE THERMIQUE, UTILISATION ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE TELLE FIBRE | [1991/17] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.1990 | Translation filed | 02.11.1990 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.1990 | Search fee paid | 02.11.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/17] | 27.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/05] | 03.09.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2007240 (SNIA VISCOSA) | International search | [Y]JPS52137029 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JPS5626005 (DU PONT); | [Y]JPS6127085 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [Y]JPS61119710 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) |