EP0426775 - AUTOMATICALLY ADJUSTABLE ENERGY CONTROLLED RATE-RESPONSIVE PACEMAKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1999 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 19.01.2000 [2000/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PACESETTER, INC. 15900 Valley View Court Sylmar, CA 91392-9221 / US | [1998/19] |
Former [1996/06] | For all designated states PACESETTER, INC. 15900 Valley View Court Sylmar, CA 91392-9221 / US | ||
For:DE
FR
GB
IT
NL
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | |||
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states Pacesetter AB Röntgenvägen 2 S-171 95 Solna / SE | ||
For:DE
FR
GB
IT
NL
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | |||
Former [1991/20] | For:SE
Siemens Elema AB Röntgenvägen 2 S-171 95 Solna 1 / SE | ||
For:DE
FR
GB
IT
NL
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANN, Brian, M. 10625 Levico Way Los Angeles, CA 90077 / US | 02 /
POORE, John, W. 1964 LaFrance Avenue South Pasadena, CA 91030 / US | [1991/20] | Representative(s) | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/06] | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | ||
Former [1995/04] | Rees, David Christopher Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 90903505.7 | 22.01.1990 | [1991/20] | WO1990US00478 | Priority number, date | US19890301935 | 25.01.1989 Original published format: US 301935 | [1991/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9008570 | Date: | 09.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0426775 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0426775 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.08.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/365 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
A61N1/36542 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/20] | A61N1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/20] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCH EINSTELLBARER, ENERGIEGESTEUERTER, RATENABHÄNGIGER SCHRITTMACHER | [1998/19] | English: | AUTOMATICALLY ADJUSTABLE ENERGY CONTROLLED RATE-RESPONSIVE PACEMAKER | [1991/20] | French: | STIMULATEUR CARDIAQUE AUTOMATIQUEMENT REGLABLE, COMMANDE PAR ENERGIE ET SENSIBLE AU RYTHME | [1998/19] |
Former [1991/20] | SELBSTTÄTIG VERSTELLBARER RATEN-EMPFINDLICHER PACEMAKER MIT GESTEUERTER ENERGIE | ||
Former [1991/20] | STIMULATEUR CARDIAQUE INTRACORPOREL AUTOMATIQUEMENT REGLABLE, COMMANDE PAR ENERGIE ET SENSIBLE AU RYTHME CARDIAQUE | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.1990 | Search fee paid | 06.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/21] | 16.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.11.1990 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.1990 | 30.11.1990 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.1990 | 30.11.1990 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.1990 | 30.11.1990 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.1990 | 30.11.1990 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.1990 | 30.11.1990 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   06.12.1990 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.03.1991 | M01   Fee paid on   27.03.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 06.08.1998 | GB | 22.01.1999 | [2000/03] |
Former [1998/47] | SE | 06.08.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0299613 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]); | [AD]US4567892 (PLICCHI GIANNI [IT], et al); | [AD]US3593718 (KRASNER JEROME L, et al); | [APD]US4202339 (BOCK THOMAS [DE], et al); | [A]EP0007189 (CREDIT DU NORD INT NV [NL]); | [AP]EP0324604 (TELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [AP]EP0327427 (GORNY PHILIPPE [FR], et al) | International search | [Y]US4576183 (PLICCHI GIANNI [IT], et al); | [Y]US4722342 (AMUNDSON DAVID [SE]); | [YP]US4807629 (BAUDINO MICHAEL D [US], et al); | [Y]US4719920 (ALT ECKHARD [DE], et al); | [YP]US4803987 (CALFEE RICHARD V [US], et al) | Examination | US4428378 |