EP0458870 - MAGNETIC KEY OPERATED LOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sedley, Bruce Samuel 24 Broadway, 8th Floor Flat A Mei Foo Sun Chuen Kowloon / HK | [N/P] |
Former [1991/49] | For all designated states SEDLEY, Bruce Samuel 24 Broadway, 8th Floor Flat A Mei Foo Sun Chuen, Kowloon / HK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/49] | Representative(s) | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/49] | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 90903620.4 | 15.02.1990 | [1991/49] | WO1990GB00246 | Priority number, date | GB19890003441 | 15.02.1989 Original published format: GB 8903441 | GB19900002222 | 01.02.1990 Original published format: GB 9002222 | [1991/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9009503 | Date: | 23.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0458870 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0458870 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/24] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0458870 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E05B47/00 | [1991/49] | CPC: |
E05B47/0043 (EP,US);
E05B47/00 (KR);
E05B35/083 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7057 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7734 (EP,US);
Y10T70/774 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/49] | Title | German: | VON EINEM MAGNETSCHLÜSSEL BETÄTIGTES SCHLOSS | [1991/49] | English: | MAGNETIC KEY OPERATED LOCK | [1991/49] | French: | SERRURE ACTIONNEE PAR UNE CLE MAGNETIQUE | [1991/49] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.1991 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 14.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/49] | 20.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.03.1995
01.12.1999
WITHDRAWN Schulte-Schlagbaum Aktiengesellschaft Nevigeser Str. 100-110 D-42553 Velbert / DE Opponent's representative Grundmann, Dirk Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.03.1995
30.03.1995
ADMISSIBLE Schulte-Schlagbaum Aktiengesellschaft Nevigeser Str. 100-110 D-42553 Velbert / DE Opponent's representative Grundmann, Dirk, Dr. Corneliusstrasse 45 D-42329 Wuppertal / DE | 13.04.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.07.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 16.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 02.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 11.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 12.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 16.05.2002 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.05.2002 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 29.10.2002 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 15.06.1994 | NL | 15.06.1994 | SE | 15.09.1994 | LU | 28.02.1995 | [2000/06] |
Former [1998/15] | DK | 15.06.1994 | |
NL | 15.06.1994 | ||
SE | 15.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/13] | NL | 15.06.1994 | |
SE | 15.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/05] | SE | 15.09.1994 | Cited in | International search | EP0276444 [ ] (SCHULTE SCHLAGBAUM AG [DE]) | Examination | DE2401602 | EP0304760 |