EP0458871 - COMPOSITE SOLDER ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAYCHEM PONTOISE S.A. 2 Boulevard du Moulin a Vent F-95800 Cergy Saint Christophe / FR | [1991/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELLALE, Jacques 36, rue de Général-Gallieni F-78510 Triel-sur-Sienne / FR | [1991/49] | Representative(s) | Dlugosz, Anthony Charles, et al Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Department Faraday Road Dorcan, Swindon Wiltshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Dlugosz, Anthony Charles, et al Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Department Faraday Road Dorcan Swindon Wiltshire / GB | ||
Former [1991/49] | Dlugosz, A.C., et al Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Department Faraday Road Dorcan Swindon Wiltshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 90903622.0 | 13.02.1990 | [1991/49] | WO1990GB00234 | Priority number, date | GB19890003311 | 14.02.1989 Original published format: GB 8903311 | [1991/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9009255 | Date: | 23.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0458871 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B23K35/26, B23K35/14 | [1991/49] | CPC: |
B23K35/262 (EP);
B23K35/0222 (EP);
H05K3/3478 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/49] | Title | German: | VERBUNDWERKSTOFF ZUM LÖTEN | [1991/49] | English: | COMPOSITE SOLDER ARTICLE | [1991/49] | French: | ARTICLE COMPOSITE DE METAL D'APPORT DE BRASAGE | [1991/49] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.1991 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 01.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/49] | 30.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/30] | 23.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE2823122 [ ] (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD); | GB2036794 [ ] (SEMI ALLOYS INC); | US4767471 [ ] (MCLELLAN NEIL R [US]); | WO8809068 [ ] (RAYCHEM LTD [GB], et al); | WO9000954 [ ] (RAYCHEM LTD [GB], et al) |