Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9009255 | Global Dossier | 23.08.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8903311 | 14.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5156790 | Global Dossier | 05.09.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8903311 | 14.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0458871 | Global Dossier | 04.12.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8903311 | 14.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2045683 | 15.08.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB8903311 | 14.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB8903311D0 | 05.04.1989 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8903311 | 14.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL93375 | 25.01.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8903311 | 14.02.1989 |