EP0407571 - PROSTHETIC HEART VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.10.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 07.12.1994 [1994/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Houston System Ezekiel Cullen Building, Room 316, 4800 Calhoun Street Houston Texas 77204-2163 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/34] | For all designated states The University of Houston System 1600 Smith, Suite 3400 Houston, Texas 77002 / US | ||
Former [1991/03] | For all designated states ONX, INC. 2204 Manana Street Austin, TX 78730 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HWANG, Ned, H., C. 2155 Lochlevin Drive Memphis, TN 38119 / US | [1991/03] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/34] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1991/03] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90903700.4 | 25.01.1990 | [1991/03] | WO1990US00567 | Priority number, date | US19890296428 | 28.01.1989 Original published format: US 296428 | [1991/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9008519 | Date: | 09.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0407571 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.08.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [1991/03] | CPC: |
A61F2/2403 (EP,US);
A61F2/24 (KR);
F16K15/03 (US);
F16K15/035 (US);
F16K15/036 (US);
Y10T137/7839 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7898 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/03] | Title | German: | PROTHESENHERZKLAPPE | [1991/03] | English: | PROSTHETIC HEART VALVE | [1991/03] | French: | VALVULE CARDIAQUE PROTHETIQUE | [1991/03] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.1990 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.1990 | Search fee paid | 27.09.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.1990 | Examination requested [1991/03] | 08.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/49] | 17.07.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/49] | 31.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4308624 (KLAWATTER JEROME J); | [A]US4423525 (VALLANA FRANCO [IT], et al); | [A]US4425670 (FIGUERA DIEGO [ES]); | [A]US4601719 (TOTTEN ROBERT P [US]); | [A]US4605408 (CARPENTIER ALAIN [FR]); | [A]EP0211576 (MCQUEEN DAVID M [US], et al); | [A]SU1304810 (KONOVALOV ARKADIJ V [SU], et al); | [A]US4775378 (KNOCH MARTIN [DE], et al) |