EP0458884 - SHIELDED RIGHT ANGLED HEADER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.1994 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.1994 [1994/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.L. GORE & ASSOCIATES, INC. 555 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark Delaware 19714-9206 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/49] | For all designated states W.L. GORE & ASSOCIATES, INC. 555 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark, Delaware 19714-9206 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOLTZ, John 408 Uxbridge Way Hockessin, DE 19707 / US | [1992/22] |
Former [1991/49] | 01 /
VOLTZ, John 114 Worral Drive Newark, DE 19711 / US | Representative(s) | Jones, Andree Zena CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/49] | Jones, Andrée Zena CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 90903702.0 | 13.02.1990 | [1991/49] | WO1990US00780 | Priority number, date | US19890311664 | 15.02.1989 Original published format: US 311664 | [1991/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9009686 | Date: | 23.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0458884 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0458884 | Date: | 28.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01R17/12 | [1991/49] | CPC: |
H01R13/6585 (EP);
H01R12/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/49] | Title | German: | GESCHIRMTER WINKELSTECKER | [1991/49] | English: | SHIELDED RIGHT ANGLED HEADER | [1991/49] | French: | BARRETTE DE CONTACT BLINDEE A ANGLE DROIT | [1991/49] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.1991 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 15.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/49] | 26.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0256697 (AMP INC [US]); | [A]FR2262473 (AMP INC [US]) |