EP0461143 - PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING THE DWELL PRESSURE PHASE DURING INJECTION MOULDING OF THERMOPLASTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1994 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lauterbach, Martin, Dr. Nizzaallee 47 W-5100 Aachen / DE | [1993/28] |
Former [1991/51] | For all designated states VEREINIGUNG ZUR FÖRDERUNG DES INSTITUTS FÜR KUNSTSTOFFVERARBEITUNG IN INDUSTRIE UND HANDWERK A. D. RHEIN.-WESTF. TECHNISCHEN HOCHSCHULE AACHEN E. V., Pontstrasse 49 D-52062 Aachen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAUTERBACH, Martin Nizzaallee 47 D-5100 Aachen / DE | 02 /
BREUER, Peter Benediktusstr. 17 D-5100 Aachen / DE | 03 /
DAHMEN, Jörg Nordhellen 8 D-5882 Meinerzhagen / DE | 04 /
BOUKES, Gerald Republikplatz 15 D-5100 Aachen / DE | [1991/51] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1991/51] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 90903809.3 | 26.02.1990 | [1991/51] | WO1990EP00318 | Priority number, date | DE19893906451 | 01.03.1989 Original published format: DE 3906451 | DE19893927995 | 24.08.1989 Original published format: DE 3927995 | [1991/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9009879 | Date: | 07.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0461143 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0461143 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/76, B29C45/77 | [1991/51] | CPC: |
B29C45/77 (EP);
B29C45/76 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN DER NACHDRUCKPHASE BEIM SPRITZGIESSEN THERMOPLASTISCHER KUNSTSTOFFE | [1991/51] | English: | PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING THE DWELL PRESSURE PHASE DURING INJECTION MOULDING OF THERMOPLASTICS | [1991/51] | French: | PROCEDE POUR REGULER LA PHASE DE MAINTIEN EN PRESSION LORS DE L'INJECTION DE THERMOPLASTIQUES | [1991/51] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.1991 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 30.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/51] | 21.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 19.01.1994 | FR | 19.01.1994 | GB | 19.01.1994 | NL | 19.01.1994 | [2004/35] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 19.01.1994 | |
GB | 19.01.1994 | ||
NL | 19.01.1994 | ||
FR | 10.06.1994 | ||
Former [1995/10] | GB | 19.01.1994 | |
NL | 19.01.1994 | ||
FR | 10.06.1994 | ||
Former [1995/04] | GB | 19.01.1994 | |
FR | 10.06.1994 | ||
Former [1994/49] | GB | 19.01.1994 | Cited in | International search | US4816197 [ ] (NUNN ROBERT E [US]) | [ ] - Kunststoffe, Band 73, Nr. 5, Mai 1983, (Munchen, DE), K. GISSING et al.: "Zum Optimalen Nachdruckverlauf beim Spritzgiessen Thermoplastischer Kunststoffe", seiten 241-245 | [ ] - Kunststoffberater, Band 33, Nr. 11, November 1988, (Isernhagen, DE), WIPPENBECK: "Isochore Prozessfuhrung beim Spritzgiessen", seiten 30-34 | [ ] - Kunststoffe, Band 78, Nr. 8, August 1988, (Munchen, DE), G. MENGES et al.: "Automatisierte Maschineneinstellung beim Spritzgiessen - Wunschtraum oder Realitat?", seiten 732-735 |