EP0424479 - BINDING FOR CROSS-COUNTRY OR TOURING SKIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.1995 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROTTEFELLA AS Frysjaveien 31 B 0883 Oslo 8 / NO | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | For all designated states ROTTEFELLA AS Frysjaveien 31 B N-0883 Oslo 8 / NO | ||
Former [1991/18] | For all designated states WITCO A-S Frysjaveien 31 B N-0883 Oslo 8 / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUGLIN, Bernt-Otto N-3490 Klokkarstua / NO | 02 /
POPP, Eugen Blombergstr. 26 D-8000 München 82 / DE | [1991/18] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90903813.5 | 19.02.1990 | [1991/18] | WO1990EP00084 | Priority number, date | DE19893912019 | 12.04.1989 Original published format: DE 3912019 | [1991/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9011806 | Date: | 18.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0424479 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0424479 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A63C9/20 | [1991/18] | CPC: |
A63C9/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/18] | Title | German: | LANGLAUF- ODER TOURENSKIBINDUNG | [1991/18] | English: | BINDING FOR CROSS-COUNTRY OR TOURING SKIS | [1991/18] | French: | FIXATION POUR SKIS DE FOND OU DE RANDONNEE | [1991/18] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/24] | 16.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.05.1994 | DK | 04.05.1994 | ES | 04.05.1994 | GB | 04.05.1994 | IT | 04.05.1994 | NL | 04.05.1994 | SE | 04.05.1994 | [2002/25] |
Former [2002/23] | BE | 04.05.1994 | |
DK | 04.05.1994 | ||
GB | 04.05.1994 | ||
IT | 04.05.1994 | ||
NL | 04.05.1994 | ||
SE | 04.05.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 04.05.1994 | |
DK | 04.05.1994 | ||
GB | 04.05.1994 | ||
IT | 04.05.1994 | ||
NL | 04.05.1994 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 04.05.1994 | |
DK | 04.05.1994 | ||
GB | 04.05.1994 | ||
NL | 04.05.1994 | ||
Former [1995/19] | BE | 04.05.1994 | |
GB | 04.05.1994 | ||
NL | 04.05.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | BE | 04.05.1994 | |
NL | 04.05.1994 | ||
Former [1995/11] | BE | 04.05.1994 | Cited in | International search | [A]NO863591 ; | [P]NO161957B (SALOMON SA SIEGE SOCIAL METZ T [FR]); | [A]NO160825B (ADIDAS SPORTSCHUHE [DE]); | [A]NO160685B (SALOMON SA [FR]); | [A]DE2942806 |