EP0461148 - TELEPHONE SUPPORT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states World Wide Product Development Co. Ltd. 12 Ascot Avenue Westcourt, Cairns, QLD, 4870 / AU | [1995/13] |
Former [1991/51] | For all designated states SUN PLAN INVESTMENTS LIMITED Level 9, One Pacific Place 88 Queensway Hong Kong / HK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAN, Dennis 342 Shanghai Street 5th Floor Kowloon / HK | [1991/51] | Representative(s) | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/51] | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90903874.7 | 28.02.1990 | [1991/51] | WO1990GB00309 | Priority number, date | GB19890004912 | 03.03.1989 Original published format: GB 8904912 | [1991/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9010348 | Date: | 07.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0461148 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0461148 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/05 | [1991/51] | CPC: |
H04M1/05 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/51] | Title | German: | TRAGEVORRICHTUNG EINES TELEFONS | [1991/51] | English: | TELEPHONE SUPPORT DEVICE | [1991/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SUPPORT TELEPHONIQUE | [1991/51] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.1991 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 04.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/51] | 07.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.1995 | BE | 03.05.1995 | CH | 03.05.1995 | DK | 03.05.1995 | ES | 03.05.1995 | FR | 03.05.1995 | IT | 03.05.1995 | LI | 03.05.1995 | NL | 03.05.1995 | SE | 03.08.1995 | DE | 04.08.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 03.05.1995 | |
BE | 03.05.1995 | ||
CH | 03.05.1995 | ||
DK | 03.05.1995 | ||
ES | 03.05.1995 | ||
IT | 03.05.1995 | ||
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
NL | 03.05.1995 | ||
SE | 03.08.1995 | ||
DE | 04.08.1995 | ||
FR | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 03.05.1995 | |
BE | 03.05.1995 | ||
CH | 03.05.1995 | ||
DK | 03.05.1995 | ||
ES | 03.05.1995 | ||
IT | 03.05.1995 | ||
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
SE | 03.08.1995 | ||
DE | 04.08.1995 | ||
FR | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 03.05.1995 | |
BE | 03.05.1995 | ||
CH | 03.05.1995 | ||
DK | 03.05.1995 | ||
IT | 03.05.1995 | ||
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
SE | 03.08.1995 | ||
DE | 04.08.1995 | ||
FR | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 03.05.1995 | |
BE | 03.05.1995 | ||
CH | 03.05.1995 | ||
DK | 03.05.1995 | ||
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
SE | 03.08.1995 | ||
DE | 04.08.1995 | ||
FR | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 03.05.1995 | |
BE | 03.05.1995 | ||
CH | 03.05.1995 | ||
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
SE | 03.08.1995 | ||
DE | 04.08.1995 | ||
FR | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | AT | 03.05.1995 | |
CH | 03.05.1995 | ||
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
DE | 04.08.1995 | ||
FR | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | CH | 03.05.1995 | |
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
DE | 04.08.1995 | ||
FR | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | CH | 03.05.1995 | |
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
DE | 04.08.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | CH | 03.05.1995 | |
LI | 03.05.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2020084 (SIDDERS MARLE A); | [A]US2481387 (BONECUTTER ARCHIE O); | [A]GB1413839 (HOLMES T); | [A]US4048453 (SEIDEL GUSTAVE); | [A]US4121061 (DONALDSON ROBERT G) |