EP0455751 - METHOD OF AND MEANS FOR TREATING A FLOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.1993 [1993/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOME HYGIENE LIMITED Brickyard Lane Studley, Warwickshire B80 7EE / GB | [1991/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCORMICK, John, Patrick Kirosa House Kings Coughton Alcester Warwickshire B49 5QD / GB | [1991/46] | Representative(s) | Lewis, Samuel H. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | Lewis, Samuel Hewitt FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90904912.4 | 20.03.1990 | [1991/46] | WO1990GB00420 | Priority number, date | GB19890026569 | 24.11.1989 Original published format: GB 8926569 | [1991/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9107902 | Date: | 13.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0455751 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A47L11/164, A47L13/12 | [1991/46] | CPC: |
A47L11/164 (EP);
A47L11/4038 (EP);
B24D7/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, NL [1991/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEHANDELN VON FUSSBÖDEN | [1991/46] | English: | METHOD OF AND MEANS FOR TREATING A FLOOR | [1991/46] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE SOLS | [1991/46] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.1991 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 02.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/05] | 06.01.1992 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 01.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/14] | 05.11.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4418438 ; | [X]FR1121812 ; | [A]US2311135 ; | [A]FR35139E |