EP0465509 - COMMUNICATION RECEIVER HAVING INFORMATIONAL DISPLAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.1994 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.1994 [1994/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1992/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEITZEN, Randi, Faith 14212 Mahogany Drive Boynton Beach, FL 33436 / US | 02 /
STAIR, Mark, Timothy 4711 Barrett Street Delray Beach, FL 33445 / US | 03 /
SHAPIRO, Steven, Curtis 8389 Morningstar Road Lake Worth, FL 33467 / US | 04 /
KUNG, Patrick, Shuang 1118 Hickory Trail West Palm Beach, FL 33414 / US | [1992/03] | Representative(s) | Lupton, Frederick, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 1PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | Lupton, Frederick, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property, Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 1PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 90905102.1 | 05.03.1990 | [1992/03] | WO1990US01067 | Priority number, date | US19890328661 | 27.03.1989 Original published format: US 328661 | [1992/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9011655 | Date: | 04.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0465509 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.10.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/00, G08B5/22 | [1992/20] | CPC: |
G08B5/229 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/03] | H04B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/03] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSEMPFÄNGER MIT INFORMATIONSANZEIGEN | [1992/03] | English: | COMMUNICATION RECEIVER HAVING INFORMATIONAL DISPLAYS | [1992/03] | French: | RECEPTEUR DE COMMUNICATION COMPORTANT DES AFFICHAGES D'INFORMATIONS | [1992/03] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.1991 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.1991 | Search fee paid | 09.09.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 09.09.1991 | Examination requested [1992/03] | 24.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/39] | 04.05.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4385295 ; | [X]US4713808 ; | [AP]US4831647 ; | [YP]US4849750 |