EP0467913 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECOVERING HEAT FROM SOLID MATERIAL SEPARATED FROM GASIFICATION OR COMBUSTION PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.1994 [1994/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A. AHLSTROM CORPORATION 29600 Noormarkku / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1992/05] | For all designated states A. AHLSTROM CORPORATION FIN-29600 Noormarkku / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISAKSSON, Juhani Kalliokoskenkatu 18 SF-48600 Karhula / FI | 02 /
OLLILA, Harry Rantamajantie 3 SF-02700 Kauniainen / FI | [1992/05] | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/05] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90905526.1 | 11.04.1990 | [1992/05] | WO1990FI00104 | Priority number, date | FI19890001748 | 13.04.1989 Original published format: FI 891748 | [1992/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9012253 | Date: | 18.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0467913 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0467913 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 18.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F23K1/02 | [1992/05] | CPC: |
C10J3/80 (EP,US);
F23C10/002 (EP,US);
F23K1/00 (EP,US);
F23K1/02 (KR);
C10J2300/0906 (EP,US);
C10J2300/1861 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/06] |
Former [1992/08] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [1992/05] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON WÄRME AUS FESTSTOFFEN, WELCHE ABGESONDERT WERDEN BEI VERGASUNGS- ODER VERBRENNUNGSPROZESSEN | [1992/05] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECOVERING HEAT FROM SOLID MATERIAL SEPARATED FROM GASIFICATION OR COMBUSTION PROCESSES | [1992/05] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE RECUPERATION DE LA CHALEUR DE MATERIAUX SOLIDES PROVENANT PAR SEPARATION DE PROCESSUS DE GAZEIFICATION OU DE COMBUSTION | [1992/05] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.1991 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 11.10.1991 | Examination requested [1992/05] | 13.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4244706 (FORNEY ALBERT J, et al); | [Y]US4111158 (REH LOTHAR, et al); | [X]US4276021 (KARNOFSKY GEORGE B, et al); | [Y]US4542621 (ANDERSSON MIKAEL [SE], et al); | [A]US3782913 (DONATH E) |