EP0473600 - PROCESS FOR ANALYSING FEET TO DETERMINE APPROPRIATE FOOTWEAR AND FOOT ANALYSIS APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHRIJVER, Floor Oregondreef 5-7 NL-3565 BE Utrecht / NL | [1992/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/11] | Representative(s) | van Assen, Jan Willem Bernard Octrooibureau Assenpatent B.V. P.O. Box 1029 2240 BA Wassenaar / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | Van Assen, Jan Willem Bernard Octrooibureau van Assen Assenpatent B.V. Postbox 1029 Konijnenlaan 22 NL-2240 BA Wassenaar / NL | ||
Former [1992/11] | Rhijnsburger, Johan Gerard Postbus 1029 NL-2240 BA Wassenaar / NL | Application number, filing date | 90905699.6 | 21.03.1990 | [1992/11] | WO1990NL00036 | Priority number, date | NL19890000693 | 21.03.1989 Original published format: NL 8900693 | [1992/11] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9011048 | Date: | 04.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0473600 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0473600 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/117, A43D1/02 | [1992/11] | CPC: |
A43D1/022 (EP);
A61B5/1174 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ANALYSIEREN VON FÜSSEN ZUR BESTIMMUNG GEEIGNETEN SCHUHWERKS UND DAFÜR GEEIGNETER FUSSANALYSEAPPARAT | [1992/11] | English: | PROCESS FOR ANALYSING FEET TO DETERMINE APPROPRIATE FOOTWEAR AND FOOT ANALYSIS APPARATUS THEREFOR | [1992/11] | French: | PROCEDE D'ANALYSE DE LA FORME DES PIEDS PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER UNE CHAUSSURE APPROPRIEE, ET APPAREIL D'ANALYSE DU PIED PREVU A CET EFFET | [1992/11] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.1990 | Translation filed | 16.10.1991 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.10.1991 | Examination requested [1992/11] | 03.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 13.07.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [1995/28] | FR | 09.12.1994 | Cited in | International search | DE3711539 [ ]; | US2998983 [ ]; | US1543747 [ ] | [ ] - Medizinisch-Orthopadische Technik, Volume 108, No. 6, November/December 1988, (Stuttgart, DE), J. GRIFKA et al.: "Die Trittspur als Diagnostisches Hilfsmittel - Hinweise zu Durchfuhrung und Auswertung", see pages 228-231 |