EP0467968 - PORTABLE ROOM DIVIDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.02.1995 [1995/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAAS, John C. 1387 Woodland Lane Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | For all designated states MAAS, Paul 1387 Woodland Lane Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | [1992/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/05] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/05] | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al c/o Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90906635.9 | 10.04.1990 | [1992/05] | WO1990US01941 | Priority number, date | US19890336267 | 11.04.1989 Original published format: US 336267 | US19900496553 | 20.03.1990 Original published format: US 496553 | [1992/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9012171 | Date: | 18.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0467968 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.10.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A47B96/04, E04B2/82 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
E04B2/7427 (EP,US);
E04B2002/7483 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/05] | E04B2/74 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/05] | Title | German: | TRAGBARE RAUMTRENNWAND | [1992/05] | English: | PORTABLE ROOM DIVIDER | [1992/05] | French: | CLOISON DE SEPARATION PORTABLE | [1992/05] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.1991 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.1991 | Search fee paid | 01.11.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 08.10.1991 | Examination requested [1992/05] | 25.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/05] | 05.09.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3387413 (HUEY BROOKS T); | [A]US3866365 (HONIGMAN MICHAEL L); | [A]DE2908290 (KNAUER DIETER); | [A]US4360991 (WEST EVELYN M); | [A]CH652434 (FERNANDE CATTIN); | [A]FR2616824 (ERBA BATIMENTS NEUFS [FR], et al) | International search | [X]US756091 (ALTICK WILLIAM B [US]); | [X]US3060521 (MICHAEL GRECO); | [X]US3387413 (HUEY BROOKS T); | [X]US3534512 (BALLAS WILLIAM); | [X]US3866365 (HONIGMAN MICHAEL L) |