EP0478562 - SNAP FIT CONTACT ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1992/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENNONA, Vincent, J., Jr. 5340 N.W. 2nd Avenue Boca Raton, Florida 33487 / US | [1992/15] | Representative(s) | Lupton, Frederick, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | Lupton, Frederick, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property, Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 1PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 90906685.4 | 09.04.1990 | [1992/15] | WO1990US01833 | Priority number, date | US19890357913 | 30.05.1989 Original published format: US 357913 | [1992/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9015455 | Date: | 13.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0478562 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0478562 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.12.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/07, H01R13/432, H01M2/10, H01M2/20 | [1995/40] | CPC: |
H01R12/62 (EP);
H01R12/58 (KR);
H01R13/432 (EP);
H05K3/4046 (EP);
H01R12/57 (EP);
H05K1/0393 (EP);
H05K2201/10295 (EP);
H05K2201/1059 (EP);
H05K3/0061 (EP);
H05K3/308 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/15] | H01R9/09, H01R9/07, H01R23/66, H01R13/428, H01R13/432 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/15] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG MIT KONTAKTSCHNAPPBEFESTIGUNG | [1992/15] | English: | SNAP FIT CONTACT ASSEMBLY | [1992/15] | French: | ENSEMBLE CONTACT ENCLIQUETABLE | [1992/15] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.1991 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.1991 | Search fee paid | 14.11.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 14.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/15] | 23.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.1995 | BE | 04.10.1995 | CH | 04.10.1995 | DK | 04.10.1995 | ES | 04.10.1995 | IT | 04.10.1995 | LI | 04.10.1995 | SE | 04.01.1996 | GB | 09.04.1996 | LU | 30.04.1996 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/06] | AT | 04.10.1995 | |
BE | 04.10.1995 | ||
CH | 04.10.1995 | ||
DK | 04.10.1995 | ||
IT | 04.10.1995 | ||
LI | 04.10.1995 | ||
SE | 04.01.1996 | ||
GB | 09.04.1996 | ||
LU | 30.04.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 04.10.1995 | |
BE | 04.10.1995 | ||
CH | 04.10.1995 | ||
DK | 04.10.1995 | ||
IT | 04.10.1995 | ||
LI | 04.10.1995 | ||
SE | 04.01.1996 | ||
GB | 09.04.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 04.10.1995 | |
BE | 04.10.1995 | ||
CH | 04.10.1995 | ||
DK | 04.10.1995 | ||
LI | 04.10.1995 | ||
SE | 04.01.1996 | ||
GB | 09.04.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | AT | 04.10.1995 | |
BE | 04.10.1995 | ||
CH | 04.10.1995 | ||
LI | 04.10.1995 | ||
SE | 04.01.1996 | ||
GB | 09.04.1996 | ||
Former [1997/13] | AT | 04.10.1995 | |
BE | 04.10.1995 | ||
CH | 04.10.1995 | ||
LI | 04.10.1995 | ||
SE | 04.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/31] | AT | 04.10.1995 | |
BE | 04.10.1995 | ||
SE | 04.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/28] | AT | 04.10.1995 | |
SE | 04.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/23] | SE | 04.01.1996 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4353609 (HAAS RICHARD M); | [X]US4526436 (ASO AKIRA [US]); | [A]US4682829 (KUNKLE JOHN P [US], et al); | [X]US4693528 (ASICK JOHN C [US], et al) | Examination | EP0274609 |