EP0471698 - PROCESS FOR DETERMINING PHYSICAL VARIABLES OF RECHARGEABLE ELECTRIC ACCUMULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/09] | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING PHYSICAL VARIABLES OF RECHARGEABLE ELECTRIC ACCUMULATORS | ||
[1993/37] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.03.1995 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/09] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 D-80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIRKLE, Michael Am Kirchberg 41 D-7500 Karlsruhe 41 / DE | 02 /
GRASEMANN, Gunther Links der Alb 22 D-7500 Karlsruhe 51 / DE | 03 /
STEUSLOFF, Hartwig Kirchfeldstrasse 60 D-7500 Karlsruhe 31 / DE | [1992/09] | Application number, filing date | 90906876.9 | 08.05.1990 | [1992/09] | WO1990DE00322 | Priority number, date | DE19893915550 | 12.05.1989 Original published format: DE 3915550 | [1992/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9013823 | Date: | 15.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0471698 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0471698 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/36 | [1992/09] | CPC: |
G01R31/367 (EP);
G01R31/3828 (EP);
G01R31/3842 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON PHYSIKALISCHEN GRÖSSEN VON WIEDERAUFLADBAREN ELEKTRISCHEN ENERGIESPEICHERN | [1993/37] | English: | PROCESS FOR DETERMINING PHYSICAL VARIABLES OF RECHARGEABLE ELECTRIC ACCUMULATORS | [1993/37] | French: | PROCEDE POUR DETERMINER DES VARIABLES PHYSIQUES CONCERNANT DES ACCUMULATEURS D'ENERGIE ELECTRIQUES RECHARGEABLES | [1993/37] |
Former [1992/09] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON PHYSIKALISCHEN GRÖSSEN VON WIEDERAUFLADBAREN ELEKTRISCHEN ENERGIESPEICHERN | ||
Former [1992/09] | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING PHYSICAL VARIABLES OF RECHARGEABLE ELECTRIC ACCUMULATORS | ||
Former [1992/09] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR DETERMINER DES VARIABLES PHYSIQUES CONCERNANT DES ACCUMULATEURS D'ENERGIE ELECTRIQUES RECHARGEABLES | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.1991 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 07.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 11.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.1994
24.05.1994
ADMISSIBLE VARTA Batterie AG Am Leineufer 51 D-30419 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Kaiser, Dieter Ralf Patentassessor, Carl-Orff-Weg 20 65812 Bad Soden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.1994
24.05.1994
ADMISSIBLE VARTA Batterie AG Am Leineufer 51 D-30419 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Kaiser, Dieter Ralf, Dipl.-Ing. Gundelhardtstrasse 72 D-65779 Kelkheim / DE | ||
Former [1994/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.05.1994
VARTA Batterie AG Am Leineufer 51 D-30419 Hannover / DE Opponent's representative Kaiser, Dieter Ralf (DE) Gundelhardtstrasse 72 D-65779 Kelkheim / DE | 28.07.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 19.12.1994 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1995/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 15.09.1993 | IT | 15.09.1993 | SE | 15.09.1993 | LU | 31.05.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [2000/06] | CH | 15.09.1993 | |
DK | 15.09.1993 | ||
IT | 15.09.1993 | ||
LI | 15.09.1993 | ||
SE | 15.09.1993 | ||
LU | 31.05.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | CH | 15.09.1993 | |
DK | 15.09.1993 | ||
IT | 15.09.1993 | ||
LI | 15.09.1993 | ||
SE | 15.09.1993 | ||
Former [1998/15] | CH | 15.09.1993 | |
DK | 15.09.1993 | ||
LI | 15.09.1993 | ||
SE | 15.09.1993 | ||
Former [1995/35] | CH | 15.09.1993 | |
LI | 15.09.1993 | ||
SE | 15.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/26] | SE | 15.09.1993 | Cited in | International search | US4390841 [ ] (MARTIN HARRY L, et al); | US4455523 [ ] (KOENCK STEVEN E [US]); | US4743831 [ ] (YOUNG JAMES E [US]); | EP0225106 [ ] (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]); | US4333149 [ ] (TAYLOR DALE F, et al); | DE3429145 [ ] (FORD WERKE AG [DE]); | DE3736481 [ ] (GRAESSLIN KG [DE]) |