EP0471709 - RUTHENIUM(III) COMPLEXES AS ANTINEOPLASTIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM ITALIA S.P.A. Via S. Uguzzone, 5 20126 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/09] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM ITALIA S.P.A. Via S. Uguzzone, 5 I-20126 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALESSIO, Enzo Via S.Uguzzone, 5 I-20126 Milano / IT | 02 /
MESTRONI, Giovanni Via S.Uguzzone, 5 I-20126 Milano / IT | 03 /
PACOR, Sabrina Via S.Uguzzone, 5 I-20126 Milano / IT | 04 /
SAVA, Gianni Via S.Uguzzone, 5 I-20126 Milano / IT | 05 /
SPINELLI, Silvano Via S.Uguzzone, 5 I-20126 Milano / IT | [1992/09] | Representative(s) | Weber, Manfred, et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Patent Department Pharma (TR-E) Sandhofener Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/09] | Weber, Manfred, Dr., et al c/o Boehringer Mannheim GmbH, Patentabteilung, Sandhoferstrasse 116 D-68298 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 90906961.9 | 02.05.1990 | [1992/09] | WO1990EP00699 | Priority number, date | IT19890020385 | 05.05.1989 Original published format: IT 2038589 | [1992/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9013553 | Date: | 15.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0471709 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0471709 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07F15/00, A61K31/28 | [1992/09] | CPC: |
C07F15/0053 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/09] | Title | German: | RUTHENIUM(III)-KOMPLEXE ALS ANTINEOPLASTISCHE MITTEL | [1992/09] | English: | RUTHENIUM(III) COMPLEXES AS ANTINEOPLASTIC AGENTS | [1992/09] | French: | COMPLEXES DE RUTHENIUM (III) EN TANT QU'AGENTS ANTINEOPLASTIQUES | [1992/09] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.1991 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 29.10.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 22.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.11.1994 | DK | 30.11.1994 | NL | 30.11.1994 | SE | 28.02.1995 | LU | 31.05.1995 | [2000/06] |
Former [1998/15] | BE | 30.11.1994 | |
DK | 30.11.1994 | ||
NL | 30.11.1994 | ||
SE | 28.02.1995 | ||
Former [1996/03] | BE | 30.11.1994 | |
NL | 30.11.1994 | ||
SE | 28.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/41] | BE | 30.11.1994 | |
NL | 30.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/35] | NL | 30.11.1994 | Cited in | International search | [ ] - Canadian Journal of Chemistry, Volume 67, No. 3, March 1989, Toronto Press, (Canada), P.K.L. CHAN et al.: "Effects of Halide (X) and Sulfoxide (R2SO) Replacement within the Ruthenium (II) Nitroimidazole Complexes, RuX2(R2SO)m(Nitroimidazole)n, m = 1-3, n = 1 or 2: their Characterization, Solution Chemistry, Radiosensitizing Activity, and Related Properties", pages 508-516 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 110, 1989, (Columbus, Ohio, US), U.C. SARMA et al.: "Complexes of Ruthenium (III) with Dimethyl Sulfoxide I. (Ru2C16 (DMSO) 4), Fac and mer Isomers of (RuC13 (DMSO) 3): Versatile Starting Materials for the Synthesis of Ruthenium (III) Complexes", see page 791* Abstract 146531k, & Polyhedron 1988, 7(18), 1727-35 (Eng)* | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 112, 1990, (Columbus, Ohio, US), G. MESTRONI: "Chemical, Biological and Antitumor Properties of Ruthenium (II) Complexes with Dimethyl Sulfoxide", see page 29* Abstract 91321a & Prog. Clin. Biochem. Med. 1989, 10* | [ ] - Journal of the Chemical Society, Dalton Transactions, 1973, I.P. EVANS et al.: "Dichlorotetrakis (Dimethyl Sulphoxide) Ruthenium (II) and its use as a Source Material for some new Ruthenium (II) Complexes, pages 204-209 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 86, 1977, (Columbus, Ohio, US), T. BORA et al.: "Some Dimethyl Sulfoxide and Sulfide Complexes of Ruthenium", see page 449* Abstract 50049u. J. Inorg. Nucl. Chem. 1976, 38(10), 1815-20 (Eng)* | Examination | - Journal of the Chemical Society, Dalton Transactions, 1973, I.P. Evans et al.: "Dichlorotetrakis (dimethyl sulphoxide) ruthenium (II) and its use as a source material for some new ruthenium (II) complexes", pages 204-209 see page 208, right-hand column, paragraph 4: "Nitrosyltrichlorobis (dimethyl sulphoxide) ruthenium (II)" |