EP0472565 - MOVING BED REACTOR INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/10] | FLUIDIZED BED REACTOR INSTALLATION | ||
[1994/11] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 05.07.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GROCHOWSKI, Horst Hafenstrasse 25 D-46117 Oberhausen / DE | [1992/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/10] | Representative(s) | Schumacher, Horst, et al Palgen, Schumacher & Kollegen Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | Schumacher, Horst, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Peter Palgen, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Horst Schumacher, Frühlingstrasse 43A D-45133 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 90907061.7 | 12.05.1990 | [1992/10] | WO1990EP00768 | Priority number, date | DE19893916325 | 19.05.1989 Original published format: DE 3916325 | [1992/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9014156 | Date: | 29.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0472565 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0472565 | Date: | 16.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/11] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0472565 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/12, B01D53/08 | [1992/10] | CPC: |
B01J8/12 (EP,US);
B01D53/08 (EP,US);
B01D2253/102 (EP,US);
B01D2257/302 (EP,US);
B01D2257/404 (EP,US);
B01D2257/602 (EP,US);
B01D2258/0291 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40007 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40081 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/10] | Title | German: | WANDERBETTREAKTORANLAGE | [1992/10] | English: | MOVING BED REACTOR INSTALLATION | [1994/11] | French: | INSTALLATION DE REACTEUR A LIT MOUVANT | [1994/11] |
Former [1992/10] | FLUIDIZED BED REACTOR INSTALLATION | ||
Former [1992/10] | INSTALLATION DE REACTEUR A LIT FLUIDISE | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.1991 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 06.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/10] | 26.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP93106615.3 / EP0574675 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.12.1994
29.12.1994
ADMISSIBLE STEAG AG Rüttenscheiderstr. 1-3 D-45128 Essen / DE Opponent's representative Geyer, Ulrich F. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.12.1994
29.12.1994
ADMISSIBLE STEAG AG Rüttenscheiderstr. 1-3 D-45128 Essen / DE Opponent's representative Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys. WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 01.02.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.09.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.01.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.01.1997 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 31.01.1997 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 19.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 21.11.2001 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.12.2001 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 19.06.2002 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 10.04.1997 | Appeal received No. T0421/97 | 10.06.1997 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.02.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 08.02.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.02.2001 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 06.11.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 06.11.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.12.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 16.03.1994 | GB | 12.05.2002 | SE | 13.05.2002 | BE | 31.05.2002 | CH | 31.05.2002 | DK | 31.05.2002 | LI | 31.05.2002 | [2005/01] |
Former [2003/48] | NL | 16.03.1994 | |
GB | 12.05.2002 | ||
BE | 31.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
DK | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | NL | 16.03.1994 | |
GB | 12.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
DK | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | NL | 16.03.1994 | |
GB | 12.05.2002 | ||
CH | 31.05.2002 | ||
LI | 31.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | NL | 16.03.1994 | |
GB | 12.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/07] | NL | 16.03.1994 | Cited in | International search | US2519874 [ ] (BERG CLYDE H O); | US2550955 [ ] (BERG CLYDE H O); | WO8808746 [ ] (GROCHOWSKI HORST [DE]) |