EP0470160 - WELL CONTROL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.06.1995 [1995/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXPLORATION AND PRODUCTION SERVICES (NORTH SEA) LIMITED 7/9 Cremyll Road Reading Berkshire RG1 8NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/07] | For all designated states EXPLORATION AND PRODUCTION SERVICES (NORTH SEA) LIMITED 7/9 Cremyll Road Reading, Berkshire RG1 8NQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDWARDS, Jeffrey, Charles 27 Earls Park Crescent Bieldside Aberdeen AB1 9AY / GB | 02 /
JOHNS, Ray 23 Baillieswells Road Bieldside Aberdeen AB1 9BL / GB | 03 /
BUCHANAN, Robert, Donald West Wing Belhelvie Lodge Belhelvie Aberdeenshire AB4 0YU / GB | [1992/07] | Representative(s) | Hooper, John Peter Lindesay 5 Haslingfield Road Harlton Cambridge CB3 7ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/07] | Hooper, John Peter Lindesay 5 Haslingfield Road Harlton, Cambridge CB3 7ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 90907239.9 | 20.04.1990 | [1992/07] | WO1990GB00606 | Priority number, date | GB19890009892 | 28.04.1989 Original published format: GB 8909892 | GB19900006586 | 23.03.1990 Original published format: GB 9006586 | [1992/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9013731 | Date: | 15.11.1990 | [1990/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0470160 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0470160 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E21B34/10, // E21B49/08 | [1992/07] | CPC: |
E21B34/103 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DK, FR, NL [1992/07] | Title | German: | STEUERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN BOHRLOCH | [1992/07] | English: | WELL CONTROL APPARATUS | [1992/07] | French: | APPAREIL DE CONTROLE POUR PUITS DE PETROLE | [1992/07] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.1991 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 18.10.1991 | Examination requested [1992/07] | 08.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | GB2074634 [ ] (HALLIBURTON CO); | GB2080365 [ ] (VANN ROY RANDELL, et al); | US4125165 [ ] (HELMUS SYDNEY S) |