Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.1994 [1994/43] |
20.10.1993 | Change - applicant | published on 08.12.1993 [1993/49] |
16.09.1993 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.11.1993 [1993/44] |
15.05.1992 | First examination report | |
14.02.1992 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.04.1992 [1992/14] |
14.02.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.04.1992 [1992/14] |