EP0477198 - METHOD FOR RECOVERING RECOMBINANT PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.1994 [1994/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitman-Moore, Inc. 421 East Hawley Street Mundelein, IL 60060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states PITMAN-MOORE, INC. 421 East Hawley Street Mundelein, IL 60060 / US | ||
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states PITMAN-MOORE, INC. P.O. Box 207 1401 South Third Street Terre Haute Indiana 47808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEHROTRA, Vikram, P. 7318 Prince Drive Terre Haute, IN 47802 / US | 02 /
BARKER, Ray, E. 30 Rigney Road Terre Haute, IN 47802 / US | [1992/14] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Michael John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Holmes, Michael John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90907861.0 | 10.05.1990 | [1992/14] | WO1990US02652 | Priority number, date | US19890364846 | 12.06.1989 Original published format: US 364846 | [1992/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9015876 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0477198 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0477198 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07K3/24 | [1993/44] | CPC: |
C07K14/61 (EP,US);
C07K1/303 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/14] | C12P21/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG REKOMBINANTER PROTEINE | [1992/14] | English: | METHOD FOR RECOVERING RECOMBINANT PROTEINS | [1992/14] | French: | PROCEDE DE RECUPERATION DE PROTEINES RECOMBINANTES | [1992/14] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.1992 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 11.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 19.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0279619 (BUNGE AUSTRALIA [AU]); | [A]EP0295859 (BUNGE AUSTRALIA [AU]) |