EP0449997 - OIL ABSORPTION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.1993 [1993/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B.G.L. PARTNERS 1001 Sixth Street, Suite 150 Manhattan Beach, CA 90266 / US | For all designated states LAFAY, William T. 1001 Sixth Street, Suite 150 Manhattan Beach, CA 90266 / US | [1991/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAFAY, William, T. 1001 Sixth Street Suite 150 Manhattan Beach, CA 90266 / US | [1991/41] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90907994.9 | 17.04.1990 | [1991/41] | WO1990US02228 | Priority number, date | US19890339259 | 17.04.1989 Original published format: US 339259 | [1991/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9012757 | Date: | 01.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0449997 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.11.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/28 | [1991/41] | CPC: |
C02F1/681 (EP,US);
E02B15/101 (EP,US);
Y02A20/204 (EP,US);
Y10S210/924 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/41] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÖLABSORPTION | [1991/41] | English: | OIL ABSORPTION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [1991/41] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ABSORPTION D'HUILE | [1991/41] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.1991 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.1991 | Search fee paid | 20.06.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/41] | 11.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/50] | 22.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.05.1991 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.1991 | 22.05.1991 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.1991 | 22.05.1991 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.1991 | 22.05.1991 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.1991 | 22.05.1991 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.1991 | 22.05.1991 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.1991 | 22.05.1991 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.1991 | 22.05.1991 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.1991 | 22.05.1991 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.1991 | 22.05.1991 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.1991 | 22.05.1991 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.1991 | 22.05.1991 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   20.06.1991 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.06.1991 | M01   Fee paid on   20.06.1991 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 04.05.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.1992 | 30.04.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents have been disclosed. | International search | [Y]US3679058 (SMITH MILLARD F); | [Y]US4439324 (CROTTI ALFRED F [GB]); | [Y]US4512890 (MEDBURY SEWARD J [US]) |