EP0470200 - PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER AND METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Engine Cooling AB Box 2064 294 02 Sölvesborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | For all designated states Valeo Engine Cooling AB Box 2064 S-294 02 Sölvesborg / SE | ||
Former [1992/07] | For all designated states TORELL AB Box 1174 S-581 11 Linköping / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEDMAN, Erik Fogdegatan 35 S-582 40 Linköping / SE | 02 /
HEDMAN, Rolf Rassnäsvägen 15 D S-591 70 Motala / SE | [1992/07] | Representative(s) | Willquist, Bo Lorentz Awapatent AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/07] | Willquist, Bo Lorentz Albihn Willquist AB S:t Larsgatan 23 S-582 24 Linköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 90908116.8 | 07.03.1990 | [1992/07] | WO1990SE00144 | Priority number, date | SE19890001553 | 28.04.1989 Original published format: SE 8901553 | [1992/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9013394 | Date: | 15.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0470200 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0470200 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 15.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B23P15/26, F28F3/08 | [1992/07] | CPC: |
B23K1/0012 (EP,US);
F28D9/0075 (EP,US);
F28F2225/08 (EP,US);
F28F2240/00 (EP,US);
F28F2280/04 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49366 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1992/07] | Title | German: | PLATTEN-WÄRMEAUSTAUSCHER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [1992/07] | English: | PLATE HEAT EXCHANGER AND METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE | [1992/07] | French: | ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE A PLAQUES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1992/07] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.1991 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 17.09.1991 | Examination requested [1992/07] | 05.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.09.1993 | BE | 08.09.1993 | DK | 08.09.1993 | NL | 08.09.1993 | LU | 31.03.1994 | [2000/06] |
Former [1998/15] | AT | 08.09.1993 | |
BE | 08.09.1993 | ||
DK | 08.09.1993 | ||
NL | 08.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 08.09.1993 | |
BE | 08.09.1993 | ||
NL | 08.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/26] | BE | 08.09.1993 | |
NL | 08.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | NL | 08.09.1993 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE122393 ; | [A]DE689873 (ERWIN SPIELVOGEL); | [A]DE1172828 (ERNST ANGRICK); | [A]DE1452552 (ALUMINIUM FRANCAIS, et al); | [A]FR2280871 (CHAUSSON USINES SA [FR]) |