EP0472606 - ADJUSTABLE LOCKING CAM ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.09.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 26.10.1994 [1994/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BROKEN HILL PROPRIETARY COMPANY LIMITED BHP House 140 William Street Melbourne, Victoria 3000 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | For all designated states THE BROKEN HILL PROPRIETARY COMPANY LIMITED BHP House 140 William Street Melbourne, Victoria 3000 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSHELL, Ronald Henry Alexander Lot 12, Churcher Road Baldivis, W.A. 6171 / AU | 02 /
KLESSENS, Wilhelmus Johanus Maria 27 Lee Avenue Hilton, W.A. 6163 / AU | [1992/10] | Representative(s) | Leiser, Gottfried, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing., et al Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90908165.5 | 18.05.1990 | [1992/10] | WO1990AU00205 | Priority number, date | AU19890004243 | 18.05.1989 Original published format: AU 424389 | [1992/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9014524 | Date: | 29.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0472606 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 29.11.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16C35/063, F16C13/02 | [1992/10] | CPC: |
B21B31/07 (EP);
F16C13/02 (EP);
F16C35/063 (EP);
F16C2322/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/10] | Title | German: | VERSTELLBARER ANSATZ FÜR VERRIEGELUNG | [1992/10] | English: | ADJUSTABLE LOCKING CAM ASSEMBLY | [1992/10] | French: | CAME DE BLOCAGE REGLABLE | [1992/10] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.1991 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.1991 | Search fee paid | 29.11.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 29.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/10] | 08.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.05.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/43] | 10.06.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3912345 (OVERTON HAROLD C); | [Y]US1821877 (WILLIAM BOWNE RAYMOND) |