EP0434787 - CHASSIS CONTROL WITH SERVO-ADJUSTMENT CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.1993 [1993/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1991/27] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASPER, Roland Lucas-Moser-Stra e 13 D-7533 Tiefenbronn / DE | 02 /
PANTHER, Michael Roetestra e 8 D-7250 Leonberg-Gebersheim / DE | 03 /
JAEKER, Karl Bleichstra e 72 D-4790 Paderborn / DE | [1991/27] | Application number, filing date | 90908461.8 | 30.05.1990 | [1991/27] | WO1990DE00401 | Priority number, date | DE19893921311 | 29.06.1989 Original published format: DE 3921311 | DE19893928993 | 01.09.1989 Original published format: DE 3928993 | [1991/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9100189 | Date: | 10.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0434787 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/08, B60G17/01 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
B60G17/018 (EP);
B60G17/08 (EP,KR);
B60G2202/24 (EP);
B60G2202/42 (EP);
B60G2204/80 (EP);
B60G2400/102 (EP);
B60G2400/252 (EP);
B60G2400/518 (EP);
B60G2500/104 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/27] | Title | German: | FAHRWERKSREGELUNG MIT STELLGLIED-ANPASSSCHALTUNG | [1991/27] | English: | CHASSIS CONTROL WITH SERVO-ADJUSTMENT CIRCUIT | [1991/27] | French: | REGULATION DU CHASSIS AVEC CIRCUIT D'ADAPTATION A ELEMENT DE REGLAGE | [1991/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 03.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/23] | 13.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0184915 ; | [A]DE3738048 (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4635959 (NAKANO YOSHIHISA [JP], et al); | [A]EP0288736 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]EP0329950 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]DE3528341 (F & O ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS); | [A]EP0215999 (WRIGHT BARRY CORP [US]) | [A] - INGENIEURS DE L'AUTOMOBILE. Oktober 1988BOULOGNE FR Seiten 83 - 88; R.S. Sharp: "Development of adaptive suspension" siehe Figur 5 |