EP0485600 - AIR BAG IN AIR BAG UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1996 [1996/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAKATA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 4-30, Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 106 / JP | [1992/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAYAMA, Yoshikazu 477-26, Inabe-cho Hikone-shi Shiga 521-11 / JP | [1992/21] | Representative(s) | Bubb, Antony John Allen Wilson Gunn Chancery House, Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | Bubb, Antony John Allen GEE & CO. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 90908665.4 | 30.05.1990 | [1992/21] | WO1990JP00701 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9118766 | Date: | 12.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0485600 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0485600 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.12.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/16 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
B60R21/217 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/21] | Title | German: | LUFTSACK IN LUFTSACKEINRICHTUNG | [1992/21] | English: | AIR BAG IN AIR BAG UNIT | [1992/21] | French: | COUSSIN PNEUMATIQUE GONFLABLE POUR INSTALLATION DE SECURITE ANTI-COLLISION | [1992/21] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.1992 | Translation filed | 06.02.1992 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.1992 | Search fee paid | 06.02.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/21] | 15.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3799573 ; | [X]FR2212799 ; | [X]US3715131 ; | [X]FR2170337 | International search | [X]JPS5766043 ; | [X]JPS5741235 ; | [A]JPS4839637U ; | [A]JPS62141562U |