EP0423328 - COINCIDENCE ARBITRATION IN A FLOW CYTOMETRY SORTING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.1996 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COULTER CORPORATION 600 West 20th Street Hialeah, FL 33010 / US | [1991/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AUER, Robert, E. 8400 S.W. 102nd Avenue Miami, FL 33173 / US | [1991/17] | Representative(s) | Nettleton, John Victor, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | Nettleton, John Victor, et al Abel & Imray Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90908853.6 | 01.05.1990 | [1991/17] | WO1990US02418 | Priority number, date | US19890345975 | 01.05.1989 Original published format: US 345975 | [1991/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9013368 | Date: | 15.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0423328 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0423328 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.11.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B07C5/342 | [1991/17] | CPC: |
B07C5/361 (EP,US);
B07C5/342 (EP,US);
G01N15/1492 (EP,US);
G01N15/149 (US);
Y10S209/906 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/17] | Title | German: | KOINZIDENZARBITRIERUNG FÜR DURCHFLUSSZYTOMETRIE | [1991/17] | English: | COINCIDENCE ARBITRATION IN A FLOW CYTOMETRY SORTING SYSTEM | [1991/17] | French: | ARBITRAGE EN CAS DE COINCIDENCE POUR SYSTEMES DE TRIAGE CYTOMETRIQUE CONTINU | [1991/17] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/50: Teilanmeldung 95106731.3 eingereicht am 04/05/95 | EPB 1995/50: Divisional application 95106731.3 filed on 04/05/95 | EPB 1995/50: Demande divisionnaire 95106731.3 déposée le 04/05/95 | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.1991 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.1991 | Search fee paid | 02.01.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 18.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP95106731.3 Application withdrawn : 21.07.1995 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 13.12.1995 | ES | 13.12.1995 | IT | 13.12.1995 | LI | 13.12.1995 | NL | 13.12.1995 | SE | 13.03.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | CH | 13.12.1995 | |
ES | 13.12.1995 | ||
IT | 13.12.1995 | ||
LI | 13.12.1995 | ||
SE | 13.03.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | CH | 13.12.1995 | |
IT | 13.12.1995 | ||
LI | 13.12.1995 | ||
SE | 13.03.1996 | ||
Former [1997/13] | CH | 13.12.1995 | |
LI | 13.12.1995 | ||
SE | 13.03.1996 | ||
Former [1996/32] | SE | 13.03.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1103190 (ATOMIC ENERGY COMMISSION); | [AD]US4230558 (FULWYLER MACK J); | [A]US4318483 (LOMBARDO IGINO, et al) | International search | [A]US3380584 (FULWYLER MACK J); | [A]US3675768 (LEGORRETA-SANCHEZ GILDARDO); | [A]US3826364 (BONNER W, et al); | [A]US3963606 (HOGG WALTER R); | [A]US4148718 (FULWYLER MACK J); | [A]US4447883 (FARRELL GREGORY A [US], et al); | [A]US4487320 (AUER ROBERT E [US]); | [A]US4510438 (AUER ROBERT [US]); | [A]US4667830 (NOZAKI JR TOM [US], et al); | [A]US4778593 (YAMASHITA MIKIO [JP], et al) |