EP0428683 - BINDER LOCKING RING MECHANISM WITH CONFIGURED TRIGGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.1991 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.1991 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.10.1991 [1991/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACCO WORLD CORPORATION 700 South Acco Plaza Wheeling, IL 60090 / US | [1991/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOPER, Edward, W. 115 Haileybury Drive Scarborough, Ontario / CA | 02 /
GUERRIERI, Orlando, R. 569 Downland Drive Pickering, Ontario L1V 1CO / CA | [1991/22] | Representative(s) | Horner, Martin Grenville, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/22] | Horner, Martin Grenville, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 90908873.4 | 07.05.1990 | [1991/22] | WO1990US02516 | Priority number, date | US19890348843 | 08.05.1989 Original published format: US 348843 | [1991/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9013441 | Date: | 15.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0428683 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B42F13/26 | [1991/22] | CPC: |
B42F13/26 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, IT, LU, NL [1991/22] | Title | German: | RINGVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE VERRIEGELUNG VON BINDERN MIT GESTALTETEM AUSLÖSER | [1991/22] | English: | BINDER LOCKING RING MECHANISM WITH CONFIGURED TRIGGER | [1991/22] | French: | MECANISME D'ANNEAU DE VERROUILLAGE POUR CLASSEUR AVEC POUSSOIR CONFIGURE | [1991/22] | File destroyed: | 09.03.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.1990 | Search fee paid | 14.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/22] | 29.08.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4813803 (GROSS RICHARD L [US]); | [A]US1897001 (DAWSON JAMES C); | [A]US1927113 (DAWSON JAMES C); | [A]US2061676 (JOHN SCHADE); | [A]US2218105 (GEARLD GRIFFIN MICHAEL); | [A]US3098490 (FRANK WANCE); | [A]US3101719 (MURRAY VERNON); | [A]US3884586 (MICHAELIS JACK H, et al); | [A]DE2362356 (KOLOMAN HANDLER GMBH) |