EP0428705 - CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.1994 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.1994 [1994/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALFA-LAVAL SEPARATION AB 147 80 Tumba / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | For all designated states ALFA-LAVAL SEPARATION AB S-147 80 Tumba / SE | ||
Former [1991/22] | For all designated states ALFA-LAVAL AB S-147 80 Tumba / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSSON, Per-Olof Trippelvägen 12 S-137 00 Västerhaninge / SE | 02 /
LAHTI, Bengt Plommongränd 5 S-151 44 Södertälje / SE | 03 /
HELLEKANT, Otto Champinjonstigen 35 S-144 00 Rönninge / SE | [1991/22] | Representative(s) | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/22] | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90909818.8 | 31.05.1990 | [1991/22] | WO1990SE00374 | Priority number, date | SE19890002127 | 13.06.1989 Original published format: SE 8902127 | [1991/22] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9015667 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0428705 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0428705 | Date: | 28.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B04B7/08 | [1991/22] | CPC: |
B04B7/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, NL, SE [1991/22] | Title | German: | ZENTRIFUGALE ABTRENNVORRICHTUNG | [1991/22] | English: | CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR | [1991/22] | French: | SEPARATEUR CENTRIFUGE | [1991/22] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.1990 | Translation filed | 14.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/22] | 19.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 28.04.1993 | [1993/52] | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8606006 ; | [A]US4820257 ; | [A]US4761115 ; | [A]US3477541 ; | [A]US1926528 |