EP0434800 - ANALYTICAL ASSAY METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.10.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEHRING DIAGNOSTICS INC. 151 University Avenue Westwood, MA 02090-2399 / US | [1995/36] |
Former [1991/27] | For all designated states PB Diagnostic Systems, Inc. 151 University Avenue Westwood, MA 02090-2399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLACKWOOD, John, J. 25 Pine Acres Road Foxboro, MA 02035 / US | 02 /
INBAR, Shai 59 Warren Avenue, Apt. 2 Boston, MA 02116 / US | 03 /
MARETSKY, Donna, R. 207 High Street Reading, MA 01867 / US | [1991/27] | Representative(s) | Reitzner, Bruno, et al Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | Reitzner, Bruno, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Splanemann Dr. B. Reitzner, Dipl.-Ing. K. Baronetzky Tal 13 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90910067.9 | 19.06.1990 | [1991/27] | WO1990US03453 | Priority number, date | US19890382555 | 19.07.1989 Original published format: US 382555 | [1991/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9101490 | Date: | 07.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0434800 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0434800 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, G01N33/52 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
G01N21/6428 (EP,US);
G01N33/525 (EP,US);
G01N2021/755 (EP,US);
Y10S435/97 (EP,US);
Y10S436/80 (EP,US);
Y10T436/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/27] | Title | German: | ANALYTISCHES TESTVERFAHREN | [1991/27] | English: | ANALYTICAL ASSAY METHOD | [1991/27] | French: | METHODE DE DOSAGE ANALYTIQUE | [1991/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 14.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.1994
17.10.1994
ADMISSIBLE Boehringer Mannheim GmbH Patentabteilung Sandhofer Strasse 116 D-68298 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.1994
17.10.1994
ADMISSIBLE Boehringer Mannheim GmbH Patentabteilung Sandhofer Strasse 116 D-68298 Mannheim / DE | 20.10.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.05.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.02.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.03.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.03.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 25.09.1997 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1997/50] | Appeal following opposition | 10.05.1996 | Appeal received No. T0441/96 | 11.07.1996 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.09.1997 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [2000/52] | CH | 18.11.1993 | |
LI | 18.11.1993 | Cited in | International search | GB2052057 [ ] (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | WO8700023 [ ] (INT BIO MEDICAL IND INC [US]); | EP0370417 [ ] (PB DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEMS INC [US]) |