EP0474787 - A PROCESS FOR TREATING INFERTILITY AND AN AGENT FOR USE IN THE PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.1997 [1997/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACOBS, Howard, S. Cobbold Laboratories The Middlesex Hospital Mortimer Street London W1N 8AA / GB | [1992/12] | Representative(s) | Christiansen, Ejvind Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | Christiansen, Ejvind HOFMAN-BANG & BOUTARD A/S Adelgade 15 DK-1304 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 90910610.6 | 31.05.1990 | [1992/12] | WO1990DK00133 | Priority number, date | DK19890002727 | 02.06.1989 Original published format: DK 272789 | [1992/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9014839 | Date: | 13.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0474787 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0474787 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 13.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/04, A61K38/24, A61K38/27 | [1996/34] | CPC: |
A61K38/24 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/24, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/24, A61K38/27, A61K38/09 (EP) |
Former IPC [1992/12] | A61K37/43, A61K37/38, A61K37/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON UNFRUCHTBARKEIT UND DAFÜR VERWENDBARES MITTEL | [1992/12] | English: | A PROCESS FOR TREATING INFERTILITY AND AN AGENT FOR USE IN THE PROCESS | [1992/12] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE LA STERILITE ET AGENT UTILISE DANS LE PROCEDE | [1992/12] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.1991 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 18.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/12] | 29.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 31.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/33] | Request for further processing for: | 02.06.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 02.06.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.06.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE2942500 (BERLIN CHEMIE VEB); | [Y]EP0161063 (HODGEN GARY D); | [A]WO8801176 (BUNGE AUSTRALIA [AU]); | [Y]WO8805662 (NORDISK GENTOFTE [DK]); | [A]EP0300982 (SERONO IND FARMA [IT]) | Examination | - Fertility and Sterility, vol. 54 (1990), pages 73-78 | - The Merck Index, 11th. ed. (1989), pages 229,860,1533,1534 |