EP0483191 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AND REGULATING THE MOULD FILLING RATE AND CASTING PRESSURE OF A LOW-PRESSURE CHILL CASTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.1994 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCAN DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Hannoversche Strasse 1 D-37075 Göttingen / DE | [1992/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILZ, Georg Albert-Schweitzer-Strasse 4 D-8500 Nürnberg 60 / DE | 02 /
LÄMMERMANN, Hans Humboldtstrasse 25 D-8540 Schwabach / DE | 03 /
DOBNER, Alfred Pelzleinstrasse 22 D-8501 Ro tal / DE | 04 /
STERNER, Klaus Felsenstrasse 41 D-8500 Nürnberg / DE | 05 /
RIESS, Klaus Hordlerstrasse 45 D-8500 Nürnberg / DE | [1992/19] | Representative(s) | Eitle, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | Eitle, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90910641.1 | 25.07.1990 | [1992/19] | WO1990EP01223 | Priority number, date | DE19893924775 | 26.07.1989 Original published format: DE 3924775 | [1992/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9101833 | Date: | 21.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0483191 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0483191 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B22D18/08 | [1992/19] | CPC: |
B22D18/08 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/19] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN UND REGELN DER FORMFÜLLGESCHWINDIGKEIT UND DES GIESSDRUCKES EINER NIEDERDRUCKKOKILLENGIESSMASCHINE | [1992/19] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AND REGULATING THE MOULD FILLING RATE AND CASTING PRESSURE OF A LOW-PRESSURE CHILL CASTING MACHINE | [1992/19] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR COMMANDER ET REGULER LA VITESSE DE REMPLISSAGE DU MOULE ET LA PRESSION DE COULEE D'UNE MACHINE DE COULEE EN COQUILLE A BASSE PRESSION | [1992/19] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.1991 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 21.08.1991 | Examination requested [1992/19] | 24.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.07.1993 | LI | 31.07.1993 | [1994/31] | Cited in | International search | US4153100 [ ] (BALEVSKI ANGEL T, et al); | US4585050 [ ] (MERRIEN PIERRE L [FR], et al) |