EP0437566 - PHENYL-GLYCINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.1995 [1995/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHINOIN Gyogyszer és Vegyészeti Termékek Gyára RT. To utca 1-5 H-1045 Budapest IV / HU | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | For all designated states CHINOIN Gyogyszer és Vegyészeti Termékek Gyára RT. To utca 1-5 H-1045 Budapest IV / HU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAN, Károly Ujvilág utca 37 H-1145 Budapest / HU | 02 /
BAN, Annamária Gogol utca 38 H-1133 Budapest / HU | 03 /
PALI, Lajosné Bán Tibor utca 5 H-1043 Budapest / HU | 04 /
KRUPPA, Márta Tamási ®t 32 H-1124 Budapest / HU | 05 /
SOMFAI, va Táncsics ®t 8 H-1014 Budapest / HU | 06 /
HUSZAR, Csaba Tamási ®t 32 H-1124 Budapest / HU | [1994/39] |
Former [1991/30] | 01 /
B N, Károly Ujvilág utca 37 H-1145 Budapest / HU | ||
02 /
B N, Annamária Gogol utca 38 H-1133 Budapest / HU | |||
03 /
P LI, Lajosné Bán Tibor utca 5 H-1043 Budapest / HU | |||
04 /
KRUPPA, Márta Tamási ®t 32 H-1124 Budapest / HU | |||
05 /
SOMFAI, va Táncsics ®t 8 H-1014 Budapest / HU | |||
06 /
HUSZ R, Csaba Tamási ®t 32 H-1124 Budapest / HU | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach CH-8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 90910864.9 | 25.07.1990 | [1991/30] | WO1990HU00051 | Priority number, date | HU19890003818 | 27.07.1989 Original published format: HU 381889 | [1991/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9101968 | Date: | 21.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0437566 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0437566 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 21.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C229/36, C07C227/18, C07C309/00, C07D307/58 | [1991/30] | CPC: |
C07D307/58 (EP,US);
C07C227/18 (EP,US);
C07C229/36 (EP,US);
C07C309/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/30] | Title | German: | PHENYLGLYCINDERIVATE | [1991/30] | English: | PHENYL-GLYCINE DERIVATIVES | [1991/30] | French: | DERIVES DE PHENYLE-GLYCINE | [1991/30] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.1991 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/40] | 19.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]ES480980 ; | [X]US3518260 (SPENCER JOHN L, et al); | [X]EP0009609 (KYOTO PHARMA IND [JP], et al) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 95, No. 24, issued 1981, December 14 (Columbus, Ohio, USA), A. KAMADA et al., "Study of enamine derivatives on phenylglycine as adjuvants for the rectal absorption of insulin", see page 374, column 2, the Abstract No. 209609m, Chem. Pharm. Bull. 1981, 29(7), 2012-19 (Eng). | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 94, No. 9, issued 1981, March 2 (Columbus, Ohio, USA), PALOMO COLL, "Enamines of amino acids and their silyl derivatives", see page 771, column 2, the Abstract No. 66063v; & ES,A,480980 (PALOMA COLL, ANTONIO LUIS)., & ES480980 A 00000000 |