EP0484380 - USES OF INTERLEUKIN-4 AND METHOD FOR PURIFYING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.03.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.1992 | Change - miscellaneous | published on 11.11.1992 [1992/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Corporation 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, NJ 07033 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | For all designated states SCHERING CORPORATION 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth New Jersey 07033 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONNEM, Eric 622 Belvidere Avenue Plainfield, NJ 07062 / US | 02 /
SULLIVAN, Lee 120 Roosevelt Boulevard Edison, NJ 08837 / US | 03 /
GRACE, Michael 22 Bonnie Rae Drive Hamilton Township, NJ 08620 / US | 04 /
BOBER, Loretta 301 Raritan Road Linden, NJ 07036 / US | 05 /
TANG, John, Chu-Tay 19 Camelot Drive Livingston, NJ 07039 / US | 06 /
NAVEH, David P.O. Box 251 NL-2300 AG Leiden / NL | 07 /
NAGABUSHAN, T., L. 3 Sunset Lane Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | 08 /
RAMAN, Jay 25 Highmont Drive West Windsor, NJ 08691 / US | [1992/20] | Representative(s) | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 90911066.0 | 26.07.1990 | [1992/20] | WO1990US04093 | Priority number, date | US19890386937 | 28.07.1989 Original published format: US 386937 | [1992/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9101744 | Date: | 21.02.1991 | [1991/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0484380 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K37/02, A61K37/66, C07K3/28, C12P21/02, // C12N15/24 ,(A61K37/66, 37:02) | [1992/20] | CPC: |
C07K14/5406 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/20] | Title | German: | ANWENDUNGEN VON INTERLEUKIN-4 AND METHODE SEINER REINIGUNG | [1992/20] | English: | USES OF INTERLEUKIN-4 AND METHOD FOR PURIFYING IT | [1992/20] | French: | UTILISATIONS DE L'INTERLEUCINE-4 ET METHODE DE PURIFICATION | [1992/20] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1992/46: Verfahren abgeschlossen infolge Verbindung mit 90308198.2/0410750 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) vom 24.09.92 | EPB 1992/46: Proceedings concluded following consolidation with 90308198.2/0410750 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 24.09.92 | EPB 1992/46: Procédure close par suite de la jonction avec la demande no. 90308198.2/0410750 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 24.09.92 | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.1992 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 27.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US4723000 [ ] (GEORGIADES JERZY A [US], et al); | WO8806891 [ ] (ASTRA AB [SE]) | [X] - Journal of Allergy and Clinical Immunology, volume 83, no. 5, May 1989, (St. Louis, US), H. Boey et al.: "Interleukin-4 is a neutrophil activator"pages 978-984 | [X] - Journal of Allergy and Clinical Immunology, volume 81, no. 1, January 1988, (St. Louis, US)R. Rosenbaum et al.: "Interleukin 4 (IL-4) is a neutrophil (PMN) activator"_see page 234 | [A] - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, volume 84, October 1987, (Washington, DC, US), D. Rennick et al.: "Interleukin 4 (B-cell stimulatory factor 1) can enhance or antagonize the factor-dependent growthof hemopoietic progenitor cells"pages 6889-6893 | [X] - Journal of Histochem. and Cytochem. (US), volume 36, no. 7A, 1988, (New York, US), W.C. Hooper et al.: "The differentiative effects of B cell growth factor on human myeloid leukemia cell lines"see page 950 | [X] - Immunology Letters, volume 21, no. 4, 7 June 1989, Elsevier, (Amsterdam, NL), T. Noma et al.: "Multiple effects of human recombinant monocyte cell lines"pages 323-328 |