EP0463121 - PROCESS FOR REMOVING COATINGS FROM SENSITIVE SUBSTRATES, AND BLASTING MEDIA USEFUL THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 20.08.1999 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Church & Dwight Co., Inc. 469 North Harrison Street Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [1992/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRSCHNER, Lawrence 33 Deer Path Drive Flanders, NJ 07836 / US | [1992/01] | Representative(s) | De Hoop, Eric, et al Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Koninginnegracht 19 2514 AB Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/11] | De Hoop, Eric, et al Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade P.O. Box 266 2501 AW Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1992/01] | Kooy, Leendert Willem, et al OCTROOIBUREAU VRIESENDORP & GAADE P.O. Box 266 NL-2501 AW The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 90911455.5 | 14.03.1990 | [1992/01] | WO1990US04203 | Priority number, date | US19890323412 | 14.03.1989 Original published format: US 323412 | [1992/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9011163 | Date: | 04.10.1990 | [1990/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0463121 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0463121 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.11.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B24C1/00 | [1992/01] | CPC: |
B24C1/086 (EP);
B24C1/00 (KR);
B24C1/003 (EP);
B24C11/00 (EP);
C01D7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON BESCHICHTUNGEN EMPFINDLICHER SUBSTRATE UND WERFMEDIA DAZU | [1992/01] | English: | PROCESS FOR REMOVING COATINGS FROM SENSITIVE SUBSTRATES, AND BLASTING MEDIA USEFUL THEREIN | [1992/01] | French: | PROCEDE D'ELIMINATION DE REVETEMENTS SUR DES SUBSTRATS SENSIBLES, ET MILIEUX DE PROJECTION ABRASIFS UTILES DANS LEDIT PROCEDE | [1994/36] |
Former [1992/01] | PROCEDE D'ELIMINATION DE REV TEMENTS SUR DES SUBSTRATS SENSIBLES, ET MILIEUX DE PROJECTION ABRASIFS UTILES DANS LEDIT PROCEDE | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.1991 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.1991 | Search fee paid | 30.08.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 30.08.1991 | Examination requested [1992/01] | 25.11.1992 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 23.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.1992 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 30.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.06.1995
22.06.1995
ADMISSIBLE Solvay (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE Opponent's representative Anthoine, Paul SOLVAY Département de la Propriété Industrielle 310, rue de Ransbeek 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.06.1995
22.06.1995
ADMISSIBLE Solvay (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE Opponent's representative Anthoine, Paul SOLVAY Département de la Propriété Industrielle 310, rue de Ransbeek 1120 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [1995/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.06.1995
22.06.1995
ADMISSIBLE Solvay (Société Anonyme) Rue du Prince Albert, 33 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE Opponent's representative Jacques, Philippe Solvay S.A. Département Propriété Industrielle 310, rue de Ransbeek B-1120 Bruxelles / BE | 14.07.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.01.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M03) | 25.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 06.06.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.06.1997 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.06.1997 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 26.05.1999 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1999/40] | Appeal following opposition | 19.07.1997 | Appeal received No. T0818/97 | 31.10.1997 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.05.1999 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 26.05.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.06.1999 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.09.1994 | BE | 07.09.1994 | CH | 07.09.1994 | DK | 07.09.1994 | LI | 07.09.1994 | NL | 07.09.1994 | SE | 07.12.1994 | ES | 18.12.1994 | LU | 14.03.1997 | [2004/38] |
Former [2004/03] | AT | 07.09.1994 | |
BE | 07.09.1994 | ||
CH | 07.09.1994 | ||
DK | 07.09.1994 | ||
LI | 07.09.1994 | ||
NL | 07.09.1994 | ||
SE | 07.12.1994 | ||
ES | 18.12.1994 | ||
LU | 31.03.1997 | ||
Former [2000/06] | AT | 07.09.1994 | |
BE | 07.09.1994 | ||
CH | 07.09.1994 | ||
DK | 07.09.1994 | ||
LI | 07.09.1994 | ||
NL | 07.09.1994 | ||
SE | 07.12.1994 | ||
LU | 31.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 07.09.1994 | |
BE | 07.09.1994 | ||
CH | 07.09.1994 | ||
DK | 07.09.1994 | ||
LI | 07.09.1994 | ||
NL | 07.09.1994 | ||
SE | 07.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 07.09.1994 | |
BE | 07.09.1994 | ||
CH | 07.09.1994 | ||
LI | 07.09.1994 | ||
NL | 07.09.1994 | ||
SE | 07.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/27] | BE | 07.09.1994 | |
CH | 07.09.1994 | ||
LI | 07.09.1994 | ||
NL | 07.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/16] | CH | 07.09.1994 | |
LI | 07.09.1994 | ||
NL | 07.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/13] | CH | 07.09.1994 | |
LI | 07.09.1994 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2710286 (ZACHARIASON RICHARD H); | [A]CA532346 (CORNING GLASS WORKS); | [A]US3933672 (BARTOLOTTA GUISEPPE, et al); | [A]US3963627 (COTTRELL ARNOLD GEORGE); | [Y]US4174571 (GALLANT BEN J [US]); | [Y]US4251579 (LEE ERIC C, et al); | [A]US4446035 (BARRAT CHRISTIAN R [BE], et al); | [A]US4652392 (BAGINSKI RICHARD M [US], et al); | [Y]US4731125 (CARR LAWRENCE S [US]); | [A]US4804488 (ALVEMARKER ARNE [SE]) | [Y] - COMCO INC., "Microblaster", Product brochure, 01 January 1986, Burbank, California, USA. |