EP0485484 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING TETRAHYDROFURAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Davy Process Technology Limited 20 Eastbourne Terrace London W2 6LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | For all designated states Davy Process Technology Limited 30 Eastbourne Terrace London W2 6LE / GB | ||
Former [1992/21] | For all designated states DAVY McKEE (LONDON) LIMITED Davy House 68 Hammersmith Road London, W14 8YW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILES, Andrew, George 12 Grimsdyke Road Hatch End Pinner Middlesex HA5 4PH / GB | 02 /
TUCK, Michael, William, Marshall 5 Riggindale Road London SW16 1QL / GB | [1992/21] | Representative(s) | Eyles, Christopher Thomas, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 90912346.5 | 27.07.1990 | [1992/21] | WO1990GB01166 | Priority number, date | GB19890017864 | 04.08.1989 Original published format: GB 8917864 | [1992/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9101981 | Date: | 21.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0485484 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0485484 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/08 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
C07D307/08 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TETRAHYDROFURAN | [1992/21] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING TETRAHYDROFURAN | [1992/21] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DU TETRAHYDROFURANE | [1992/21] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.1992 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 20.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/21] | 29.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.1995 | CH | 25.10.1995 | DK | 25.10.1995 | LI | 25.10.1995 | SE | 25.01.1996 | [1998/15] |
Former [1997/13] | AT | 25.10.1995 | |
CH | 25.10.1995 | ||
LI | 25.10.1995 | ||
SE | 25.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/28] | AT | 25.10.1995 | |
SE | 25.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/23] | SE | 25.01.1996 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0255400 (DAVY MCKEE LONDON [GB]); | [Y]DE3726805 (BASF AG [DE]) | [Y] - Ind. Eng. Chem. Process Res. Dev., Vol. 24, 1985 Samir I. Abu-Eishah et al.: "Design and Control of a Two-Column Azeotropic Distillation System ", | Examination | - INDUSTRIAL ENGINEERING CHEMICAL PROCESS RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT, vol. 24, 1985; S.I. ABU-EISHAH et al., pp. 132-137 |