EP0484443 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO SUGAR PRODUCTION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.1997 [1997/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLETCHER SMITH LIMITED Norman House Friar Gate Derby DE1 1NU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | For all designated states FLETCHER SMITH LIMITED Norman House Friar Gate Derby DE1 1NU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THELWALL, John, Champion de Crespigny Fletcher Smith Limited Norman House Friar Gate DE1 1NU / GB | [1992/20] | Representative(s) | Drever, Ronald Fergus Swindell & Pearson 48, Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [1993/19] |
Former [1992/20] | Drever, Ronald Fergus Swindell & Pearson 48, Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 90912399.4 | 27.07.1990 | [1992/20] | WO1990GB01172 | Priority number, date | GB19890017313 | 28.07.1989 Original published format: GB 8917313 | [1992/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9101785 | Date: | 21.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0484443 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0484443 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B01D9/02, C13F1/02 | [1992/20] | CPC: |
C13B30/023 (EP,US);
B01D9/0022 (EP,US);
B01D9/0031 (EP,US);
B01D9/0036 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/20] | Title | German: | WEITERENTWICKLUNG EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZUCKERHERSTELLUNG | [1996/35] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO SUGAR PRODUCTION APPARATUS | [1992/20] | French: | AMELIORATIONS RELATIVES A UN APPAREIL DE PRODUCTION DE SUCRE | [1992/20] |
Former [1992/20] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZUCKERHERSTELLUNG | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.1992 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 22.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/20] | 05.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE543328 [ ] (WERKSPOOR NV); | DE1047128 [ ] (MAIZENA WERKE G M B H DEUTSCHE); | FR1324801 [ ] (SUEDDEUTSCHE ZUCKER AG); | GB1141639 [ ] (FIVES LILLIE CAIL SOC); | GB1190243 [ ] (FLETCHER AND STEWART LTD) |