EP0491731 - COMBINATORIAL CIRCUIT COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme Aktiengesellschaft Fürstenallee 7 33102 Paderborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states Siemens Nixdorf Informationssysteme Aktiengesellschaft Fürstenallee 7 D-33102 Paderborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWARZ, Karl Lohnberg 1 D-8908 Krumbach/Attenhausen / DE | 02 /
BARTUSSEK, Horst Dr. Schmetzingstr. 85 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | 03 /
RETTENMAIER, Helmut Buchenstr. 16 D-8934 Grossaitingen / DE | [1992/27] | Representative(s) | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, et al Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90912749.0 | 11.09.1990 | [1992/27] | WO1990DE00697 | Priority number, date | DE19893930432 | 12.09.1989 Original published format: DE 3930432 | [1992/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9104605 | Date: | 04.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0491731 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0491731 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335 | [1992/27] | CPC: |
H02M3/33507 (EP,US);
H02M1/0006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/27] | Title | German: | SCHALTNETZTEIL | [1992/27] | English: | COMBINATORIAL CIRCUIT COMPONENT | [1992/27] | French: | ELEMENT DE RESEAU COMBINATOIRE | [1992/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.1992 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE | 28.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/27] | 16.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0301386 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 31, no. 5, Oktober 1988, NEW YORK US Seiten 424 - 425; "Low loss -type starter circuit for switching mode power supply" siehe das ganze Dokument |