EP0490926 - POLYURETHANE FOAM DOSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.1993 [1993/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soudan, Freddy Delphin Rabotstraat, 81 B-9000 GENT / BE | [1992/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/26] | Representative(s) | Vanderperre, Robert, et al Gevers Livornostraat 7 1060 Brussel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | Vanderperre, Robert, et al Bureau Vander Haeghen S.A. Rue Colonel Bourg 108 A B-1040 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 90912972.8 | 06.09.1990 | [1992/26] | WO1990BE00050 | Priority number, date | BE19890000960 | 08.09.1989 Original published format: BE 8900960 | [1992/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9103362 | Date: | 21.03.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0490926 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29B7/76 | [1992/26] | CPC: |
B29B7/7678 (EP,US);
B29B7/60 (EP);
B29B7/801 (EP);
B29K2105/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/26] | Title | German: | POLYURETANSCHAUMDOSIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [1992/26] | English: | POLYURETHANE FOAM DOSING APPARATUS | [1992/26] | French: | APPAREIL DOSEUR DE MOUSSE DE POLYURETHANE | [1992/26] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.1992 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 26.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/26] | 30.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/38] | 28.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0278849 [ ] (COMPTOIR GENERAL D EMBALLAGE S [FR]); | EP0204577 [ ] (OLIN CORP [US]); | EP0068670 [ ] (GUSMER CORP [US]); | US3945569 [ ] (SPERRY CHARLES R); | US3263928 [ ] (GUSMER FREDERICK E); | WO8606654 [ ] (INSTA FOAM PROD INC [US]) |