EP0487614 - FRICTION GRIP FOR TUBULAR GOODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.1996 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.1996 [1996/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANKS CASING CREW AND RENTAL TOOLS, INC. 700 Verot School Rd. Lafayette, LA 70503 / US | For all designated states BOULIGNY, Vernon 910 Iberia street New Iberia, LA 70560 / US | For all designated states WEBRE, Mike 208 Persimmon Place Lafayette, LA 70507 / US | [1992/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOULIGNY, Vernon 910 Iberia Street New Iberia, LA 70560 / US | 02 /
WEBRE, Mike 208 Persimmon Place Lafayette, LA 70507 / US | [1992/23] | Representative(s) | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90913106.2 | 15.08.1990 | [1992/23] | WO1990US04616 | Priority number, date | US19890394949 | 17.08.1989 Original published format: US 394949 | [1992/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9102693 | Date: | 07.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0487614 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0487614 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.03.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B66C1/46 | [1992/23] | CPC: |
E21B19/161 (EP,US);
B25B13/5016 (EP,US);
B25B5/065 (EP,US);
B66C1/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/23] | Title | German: | REIBUNGSGREIFER FÜR ROHRFÖRMIGE GEGENSTÄNDE | [1992/23] | English: | FRICTION GRIP FOR TUBULAR GOODS | [1992/23] | French: | MACHOIRE A FRICTION POUR SAISIR DES OBJETS TUBULAIRES | [1992/23] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.1992 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.1992 | Search fee paid | 13.02.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 13.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/23] | 25.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.02.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.07.1995 | [1996/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP61206825 ; | [A]DE1171837 (WALBERSDORF SONDERMASCHB); | [A]FR1524356 (BERTIN & CIE) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 44 (M-560)(2491) 10 February 1987 & JP-A-61 206 825 ( YASUYUKI KAWAMORITA ) 13 September 1986, & JP61206825 A 19860913 | International search | [A]US2992023 (YANTIS ROY C); | [A]US3542354 (FITZPATRICK PAUL); | [A]FR2429957 (KLEBER COLOMBES [FR]); | [A]US4403801 (HUFF EDWARD R [US], et al); | [A]US4687189 (STOLL KURT [DE], et al); | [A]US4712284 (COYLE SR WILLIAM E [US], et al); | [A]US4714289 (ARZENTI THOMAS E [US], et al) |