EP0443035 - DECENTRALIZED DATA BASE SYSTEM AND METHOD OF DATA RETRIEVAL PROCESSING THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.04.1997 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 28.05.1997 [1997/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/35] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYU, Tadamitsu 1-604 Konandai Kotohausu 1151-121, Kamigocho Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 247 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHARA, Toshio 578-1, Futago Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213 / JP | 03 /
HIRONO, Shingo 3-23-6-403, Nerima Nerima-ku Tokyo 176 / JP | 04 /
MATSUMOTO, Tohru 1156-1, Nagatsutacho Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227 / JP | 05 /
KAKEHI, Gen 20-9-101, Edaminami 5-chome Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227 / JP | 06 /
NOGI, Yoshio 102-4, Hiraicho Tochigi-shi Tochigi 328 / JP | 07 /
FUKATSU, Takanori 101 Sankei Manshon 665, Miyazaki Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213 / JP | 08 /
TOMITA, Masao 5-260, Mihashi Omiya-shi Saitama 331 / JP | 09 /
OHSHIRO, Takashi W-8-210 Fujitsu Nakaharahausu 532, Shimokodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [1991/35] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/35] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90913228.4 | 11.09.1990 | [1991/35] | WO1990JP01164 | Priority number, date | JP19890239439 | 14.09.1989 Original published format: JP 23943989 | JP19890265571 | 12.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26557189 | JP19890337033 | 26.12.1989 Original published format: JP 33703389 | JP19890339368 | 27.12.1989 Original published format: JP 33936889 | [1991/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9104534 | Date: | 04.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0443035 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.04.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/00 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
G06F16/27 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/35] | Title | German: | DEZENTRALES DATEISYSTEM UND DATENWIEDERAUFFINDUNGSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [1991/35] | English: | DECENTRALIZED DATA BASE SYSTEM AND METHOD OF DATA RETRIEVAL PROCESSING THEREFOR | [1991/35] | French: | SYSTEME A BASE DE DONNEES DECENTRALISEE ET PROCEDE D'EXECUTION DE L'EXTRACTION DE DONNEES DESTINE A CELUI-CI | [1991/35] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.1991 | Translation filed | 14.05.1991 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.1991 | Search fee paid | 14.05.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/35] | 21.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/22] | 19.01.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/22] | Request for further processing for: | 29.03.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 29.03.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.04.1996 | Decision despatched | 28.03.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 28.03.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 15.04.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1996 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0204993 (IBM [US]); | [X]EP0213277 (IBM [US]) | International search | [Y]JPS61283943 (IBM); | [Y]JPS62125445 (IBM); | [Y]JPS62126458 (IBM); | [Y]JPS62198929 (RICOH KK) |