EP0440779 - DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE FLOW OF A GAS CONTAINING PARTICULATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIBBEY-OWENS-FORD CO. 811 Madison Avenue Toledo, OH 43695 / US | [1991/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFER, Peter, H. 9775 Carnoustie Road Perrysburg, OH 43551 / US | 02 /
GORDON, Roy, G. 22 Highland Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [1991/33] | Representative(s) | Hands, Horace Geoffrey, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/33] | Hands, Horace Geoffrey, et al LEWIS W. GOOLD & CO. Whitehall Chambers 23, Colmore Row Birmingham B3 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 90913633.5 | 24.08.1990 | [1991/33] | WO1990US04837 | Priority number, date | US19890398718 | 25.08.1989 Original published format: US 398718 | [1991/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9102947 | Date: | 07.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0440779 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0440779 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.03.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/42, G01F1/36, G01F1/40, G01F15/12 | [1993/29] | CPC: |
G01F1/36 (EP,US);
G01F1/42 (EP,US);
G01F15/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/33] | G01F1/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/33] | Title | German: | DEBITMESSANORDNUNG FÜR EIN PARTIKEL ENTHALTENDES GAS | [1991/33] | English: | DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE FLOW OF A GAS CONTAINING PARTICULATES | [1991/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DU DEBIT D'UN GAZ CONTENANT DES PARTICULES | [1991/33] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.1991 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.1991 | Search fee paid | 06.05.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/37] | 07.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/41] | Request for further processing for: | 19.05.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 17.05.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.06.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.10.1995 | CH | 18.10.1995 | DK | 18.10.1995 | LI | 18.10.1995 | SE | 18.01.1996 | [1998/15] |
Former [1997/28] | AT | 18.10.1995 | |
CH | 18.10.1995 | ||
LI | 18.10.1995 | ||
SE | 18.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/28] | AT | 18.10.1995 | |
SE | 18.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/23] | SE | 18.01.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP57057217 ; | [A]DE1187385 (KINEMATICS LTD) | [YD] - ISHM-INTERNEPEON TECHNICAL SEMINAR (INT.MICROELECTRON.SYMP.) 18 January 1983, TOKYO,JP pages 1 - 10 N.M.GRALENSKI 'Thin Films by Conveyorized Atmospheric CVD' | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 133 (P-129)20 July 1982 & JP-A-57 057 217 ( TOSHIBA ), & JP57057217 A 19820720 | International search | [A]US2058654 (ALLTON ROBERT A); | [A]US2337921 (PETROE GREGORY A); | [A]US4651572 (ALBERTZ THEODOR [DE], et al); | [A]US4671109 (HALMI DEZSOE [US]) |