EP0474793 - FLUID MIXING APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING VARIABLY CARBONATED WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lancer Corporation 235 West Turbo Street San Antonio, TX 78216 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | For all designated states LANCER CORPORATION 235 West Turbo Street San Antonio, TX 78216 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDWARDS, William, A. P.O. Box 685, Windtree La Vernia, TX 78121 / US | 02 /
DURHAM, Samuel 3539 Oakhorn San Antonio, TX 78247 / US | [1992/12] | Representative(s) | Jones, Andree Zena, et al CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | Jones, Andrée Zena, et al CRUIKSHANK & FAIRWEATHER 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 90913803.4 | 31.05.1990 | [1992/12] | WO1990US03054 | Priority number, date | US19890359223 | 31.05.1989 Original published format: US 359223 | [1992/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9015275 | Date: | 13.12.1990 | [1990/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0474793 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0474793 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01F5/00, B67D1/00, F16K17/30 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
B67D1/0082 (EP,US);
F16K17/30 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87684 (EP,US);
Y10T137/88054 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/12] | F16K15/04, F16K47/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/12] | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUM MISCHEN VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN FÜR DIE ZUBEREITUNG VON WASSER MIT VARIABLEM KOHLENSÄUREGEHALT | [1992/12] | English: | FLUID MIXING APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING VARIABLY CARBONATED WATER | [1992/12] | French: | APPAREIL DE MELANGE D'UN FLUIDE PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE DE L'EAU AVEC UN DEGRE DE GAZEIFICATION VARIABLE | [1992/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.1991 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.1991 | Search fee paid | 12.09.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.12.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 12.09.1991 | Examination requested [1992/12] | 13.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.06.1995 | BE | 28.06.1995 | CH | 28.06.1995 | DK | 28.06.1995 | LI | 28.06.1995 | NL | 28.06.1995 | SE | 28.09.1995 | [2003/07] |
Former [1998/15] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
BE | 28.06.1995 | ||
CH | 28.06.1995 | ||
DK | 28.06.1995 | ||
LI | 28.06.1995 | ||
SE | 28.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | AT | 28.06.1995 | |
BE | 28.06.1995 | ||
CH | 28.06.1995 | ||
LI | 28.06.1995 | ||
SE | 28.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | BE | 28.06.1995 | |
CH | 28.06.1995 | ||
LI | 28.06.1995 | ||
SE | 28.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | CH | 28.06.1995 | |
LI | 28.06.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1161144 ; | [A]GB1108723 (WEATHERHEAD CO); | [A]US4590962 (TESPA BRIAN [CA]); | [X]DE3707352 (FESTO KG [DE]) | International search | [A]US2279513 (DAVID HAGE); | [Y]US2546258 (FARRELL RICHARD R); | [A]US3599668 (RICARDI ROLAND P); | [Y]US4217931 (JACKEL GUNTER [CA]); | [A]US4821925 (WILEY RONALD L [US], et al) |