EP0452432 - OIL FILTER CONSTRUCTION FOR HAND SPINNING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.1996 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huang, Andrew, B. 28442 Lomo Drive, Rancho Palos Verdes, CA 90274 / US | [1991/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/43] | Representative(s) | Harvey, David Gareth, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | Harvey, David Gareth, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 90914091.5 | 29.08.1990 | [1991/43] | WO1990US04914 | Priority number, date | US19890402083 | 01.09.1989 Original published format: US 402083 | [1991/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9103300 | Date: | 21.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0452432 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0452432 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.03.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B01D27/08 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
B01D35/30 (EP,US);
B01D2201/24 (EP,US);
Y10S210/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/43] | Title | German: | ÖLFILTERAUFBAU FÜR HANDAUFDREHEN | [1991/43] | English: | OIL FILTER CONSTRUCTION FOR HAND SPINNING | [1991/43] | French: | CONSTRUCTION DE FILTRE A HUILE POUR ROTATION A LA MAIN | [1991/43] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.1991 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.1991 | Search fee paid | 23.04.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/44] | 21.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/44] | Request for further processing for: | 13.08.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 13.08.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.08.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.1995 | BE | 08.11.1995 | CH | 08.11.1995 | DK | 08.11.1995 | ES | 08.11.1995 | IT | 08.11.1995 | LI | 08.11.1995 | NL | 08.11.1995 | SE | 08.02.1996 | [2008/02] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 08.11.1995 | |
BE | 08.11.1995 | ||
CH | 08.11.1995 | ||
DK | 08.11.1995 | ||
ES | 08.11.1995 | ||
IT | 08.11.1995 | ||
LI | 08.11.1995 | ||
NL | 08.11.1995 | ||
SE | 08.02.1996 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 08.11.1995 | |
BE | 08.11.1995 | ||
CH | 08.11.1995 | ||
DK | 08.11.1995 | ||
ES | 08.11.1995 | ||
IT | 08.11.1995 | ||
LI | 08.11.1995 | ||
SE | 08.02.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 08.11.1995 | |
BE | 08.11.1995 | ||
CH | 08.11.1995 | ||
DK | 08.11.1995 | ||
IT | 08.11.1995 | ||
LI | 08.11.1995 | ||
SE | 08.02.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 08.11.1995 | |
BE | 08.11.1995 | ||
CH | 08.11.1995 | ||
DK | 08.11.1995 | ||
LI | 08.11.1995 | ||
SE | 08.02.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 08.11.1995 | |
BE | 08.11.1995 | ||
CH | 08.11.1995 | ||
LI | 08.11.1995 | ||
SE | 08.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/31] | AT | 08.11.1995 | |
BE | 08.11.1995 | ||
SE | 08.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/30] | AT | 08.11.1995 | |
SE | 08.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/28] | AT | 08.11.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2341888 (WHITE ALBERT R); | [A]US2605904 (OGILVIE FRANK R); | [X]FR1173331 (FRAM CORP); | [Y]US4495072 (FIELDS LARRY D [US]); | [A]US4615812 (DARLING PHILLIP H [US]); | [Y]US4851117 (FOUST KENNETH A [US]) | International search | US2801751 [ ] (THOMAS WILLIAM A); | DE1189520 [ ] (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER); | US3473666 [ ] (HUMBERT KINGSLEY E JR); | US3722691 [ ] (FRANCOIS P); | FR2300600 [ ] (DBA [FR]); | US4364829 [ ] (ATKINS DONALD A, et al); | US4871455 [ ] (TERHUNE RALPH D [US], et al) |