|
05.12.2001 |
Transmission of the new certificate for a European patent pursuant to 87 EPC in conjunction with Rule 74 EPC |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2001 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2001 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2001 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2001 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.2001 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.10.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.07.2001 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.07.2001 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.07.2001 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Description |
Opposition |
20 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
37 |
|
01.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.02.2001 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.02.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.02.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.02.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.02.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
20.02.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.02.2001 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
17.02.2001 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2001 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
10 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
10 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
16 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
16 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
16 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
9 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
05.01.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
26 |
|
03.01.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
101 |
|
22.12.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.12.2000 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.12.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.11.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.2000 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.2000 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.06.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2000 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Request for assignment |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2000 |
Request for assignment |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2000 |
Request for assignment |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.06.2000 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
07.06.2000 |
Request for assignment |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.06.2000 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.06.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2000 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.03.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.03.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.03.2000 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.03.2000 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
10.02.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.2000 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2000 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.1999 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.06.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.06.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.04.1999 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.04.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.04.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.1999 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.04.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.04.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.03.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.03.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.03.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.1999 |
N/A |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
38 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
13 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
18 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
30 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.1999 |
N/A |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.03.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.03.1999 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.03.1999 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.08.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.1998 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.1998 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.08.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.1998 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.08.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.1998 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.08.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.1998 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.1998 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.1998 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.12.1997 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
24.10.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.10.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1996 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.1996 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
17.09.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
66 |
|
13.09.1996 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.1996 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
09.09.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
09.09.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.09.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.09.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
09.09.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.09.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.09.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.09.1996 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
27 |
|
06.09.1996 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.10.1995 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.1995 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.1995 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
21.04.1995 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
24.03.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1995 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.1995 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.01.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.1995 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.1994 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.1994 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.1994 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.1994 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.07.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
114 |
|
14.06.1994 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.05.1994 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
23.09.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.09.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.09.1993 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
11.08.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.1993 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.1993 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
12.10.1992 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.1992 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.1992 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
09.09.1992 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.09.1992 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.1992 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.1992 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.1992 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.1991 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.1991 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.1991 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.1991 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.1991 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.1991 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.1991 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.05.1991 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.05.1991 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.04.1991 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.04.1991 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
118 |
|
04.04.1991 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
108 |
|
12.10.1990 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.1981 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |