Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9817320 | Global Dossier | 30.04.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA9600700 | 18.10.1996 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9606622 | Global Dossier | 07.03.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46832895 | 06.06.1995 | CA2131130 | 30.08.1994 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | CA2145605 | 27.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9530423 | Global Dossier | 21.12.1995 | A3 | WO9530423 | 16.11.1995 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | CA2122519 | 29.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9529683 | Global Dossier | 09.11.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2122551 | 29.04.1994 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9526193 | Global Dossier | 05.10.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83867492 | 21.02.1992 | CA9400188 | 25.03.1994 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | US95209592 | 28.09.1992 | US83867592 | 21.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9407505 | Global Dossier | 14.04.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83867492 | 21.02.1992 | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | US95209592 | 28.09.1992 | US83867592 | 21.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9316733 | Global Dossier | 02.09.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9316732 | Global Dossier | 02.09.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006128655 | Global Dossier | 15.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | US24581605 | 07.10.2005 | US62899903 | 28.07.2003 | CA9000306 | 18.09.1990 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | US54739400 | 11.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004019011 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | US62899903 | 28.07.2003 | CA9000306 | 18.09.1990 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | US54739400 | 11.04.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH10504828 | Global Dossier | 12.05.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2131130 | 30.08.1994 | CA9500477 | 11.08.1995 | CA2145605 | 27.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH09512797 | Global Dossier | 22.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | CA9500259 | 28.04.1995 | CA2122519 | 29.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH07506812 | Global Dossier | 27.07.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | CA9300061 | 16.02.1993 | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4005628B | Global Dossier | 07.11.2007 | B2 | JPH07507054 | 03.08.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | CA9300062 | 16.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3811500B | Global Dossier | 23.08.2006 | B2 | JPH09512537 | 16.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2122551 | 29.04.1994 | CA9500243 | 27.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3742955B | Global Dossier | 08.02.2006 | B2 | JPH08506797 | 23.07.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | CA9300388 | 22.09.1993 | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0952855 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2005 | B1 | EP0952855 | 03.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA9600700 | 18.10.1996 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0778776 | Global Dossier | 18.06.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2131130 | 30.08.1994 | CA9500477 | 11.08.1995 | CA2145605 | 27.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0760667 | Global Dossier | 12.03.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA9500259 | 28.04.1995 | CA2122519 | 29.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0758246 | Global Dossier | 19.02.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2122551 | 29.04.1994 | CA9500243 | 27.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0661981 | Global Dossier | 07.08.1996 | B1 | EP0661981 | 12.07.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA9300388 | 22.09.1993 | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0656213 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2002 | B1 | EP0656213 | 07.06.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | EP90914108 | 18.09.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0626864 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2003 | B1 | EP0626864 | 07.12.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | CA9300062 | 16.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0626863 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2001 | B1 | EP0626863 | 07.12.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA9300061 | 16.02.1993 | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU739601B | Global Dossier | 18.10.2001 | B2 | AU7272196 | 15.05.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | CA9600700 | 18.10.1996 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU702929B | Global Dossier | 11.03.1999 | B2 | AU7022496 | 19.12.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | AU4812693 | 22.09.1993 | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | AU7022496 | 16.10.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6433090 | Global Dossier | 18.04.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | AU6433090 | 18.09.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6422294 | Global Dossier | 17.10.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US83867492 | 21.02.1992 | CA9400188 | 25.03.1994 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | US95209592 | 28.09.1992 | US83867592 | 21.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU674894C | Global Dossier | 14.03.2002 | C | AU674894B | 16.01.1997 | B2 | AU5227493 | 03.03.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | AU6433090 | 18.09.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU670117B | Global Dossier | 04.07.1996 | B2 | AU4812693 | 26.04.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | CA9300388 | 22.09.1993 | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4273297 | Global Dossier | 15.01.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU768058B | Global Dossier | 27.11.2003 | B2 | AU4272900 | 28.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | AU4273297 | 20.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3488993 | Global Dossier | 13.09.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3488893 | Global Dossier | 13.09.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3159595 | Global Dossier | 22.03.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2131130 | 30.08.1994 | CA9500477 | 11.08.1995 | CA2145605 | 27.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU696373B | Global Dossier | 10.09.1998 | B2 | AU2402395 | 29.11.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | CA9500259 | 28.04.1995 | CA2122519 | 29.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2300895 | Global Dossier | 29.11.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2122551 | 29.04.1994 | CA9500243 | 27.04.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0445255 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2001 | B2 | EP0445255 | 06.12.1995 | B1 | EP0445255 | 11.09.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | CA9000306 | 18.09.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AP448 | 18.01.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AP475 | 08.03.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AP476 | 18.03.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AP618 | 10.10.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2131130 | 30.08.1994 | CA2145605 | 27.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE141054T | 15.08.1996 | T1 | Priority number | Date | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE200736T | 15.05.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | CA9300061 | 16.02.1993 | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE244020T | 15.07.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | CA9300062 | 16.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9006924 | 10.12.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | CA9000306 | 18.09.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9307221 | 27.07.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | CA9300388 | 22.09.1993 | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2061566 | 09.07.2002 | C | CA2061566 | 21.08.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2061703 | 02.07.2002 | C | CA2061703 | 21.08.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2079205 | 10.02.1998 | C | CA2079205 | 26.03.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2122519 | 20.02.2001 | C | CA2122519 | 30.10.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2122519 | 29.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2122551 | 30.10.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2122551 | 29.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2131130 | 01.03.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2131130 | 30.08.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2145605 | 28.09.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2145605 | 27.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2268476 | 30.04.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA9600700 | 18.10.1996 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1057908C | 01.11.2000 | C | CN1092654 | 28.09.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1078388 | 17.11.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1103219C | 19.03.2003 | C | CN1084064 | 23.03.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1130532 | 11.09.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2131130 | 30.08.1994 | CA2145605 | 27.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1151118 | 04.06.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2122519 | 29.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ288986 | 17.10.2001 | B6 | CZ66295 | 14.02.1996 | A3 | Priority number | Date | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ290534 | 14.08.2002 | B6 | CZ9300229A3 | 12.06.2002 | A3 | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ290637 | 11.09.2002 | B6 | CZ9300230A3 | 12.06.2002 | A3 | Priority number | Date | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ308996 | 14.01.1998 | A3 | Priority number | Date | CA2122519 | 29.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69024039T | 12.12.2002 | T3 | DE69024039T | 13.06.1996 | T2 | DE69024039D1 | 18.01.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | CA9000306 | 18.09.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69303931T | 09.01.1997 | T2 | DE69303931D1 | 12.09.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CA9300388 | 22.09.1993 | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69330180T | 29.11.2001 | T2 | DE69330180D1 | 31.05.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CA9300061 | 16.02.1993 | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69333072T | 22.04.2004 | T2 | DE69333072D1 | 07.08.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | CA9300062 | 16.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69634993T | 20.04.2006 | T2 | DE69634993D1 | 01.09.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CA9600700 | 18.10.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0445255T | 18.02.2002 | T4 | DK0445255T | 04.03.1996 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | CA9000306 | 18.09.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0626863T | 30.07.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CA9300061 | 16.02.1993 | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0626864T | 20.10.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | CA9300062 | 16.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0661981T | 23.12.1996 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2091031T | 16.10.1996 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2156124T | 16.06.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2202311T | 01.04.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI113522B | 14.05.2004 | B | FI943789 | 03.10.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | CA9300061 | 16.02.1993 | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR3021171T | 31.12.1996 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CA9300388 | 22.09.1993 | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR3036164T | 31.10.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CA9300061 | 16.02.1993 | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1005982 | 05.02.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | CA9300062 | 16.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1005983 | 05.02.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA9300061 | 16.02.1993 | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK35397 | 27.03.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | CA9300388 | 22.09.1993 | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK44797 | 18.04.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | CA9000306 | 18.09.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU211689A9 | 28.12.1995 | A9 | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU211698A9 | 28.12.1995 | A9 | Priority number | Date | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU211823A9 | 28.12.1995 | A9 | Priority number | Date | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU225963 | 28.01.2008 | B1 | HUT70440 | 30.10.1995 | A | HU9303283D0 | 28.03.1994 | D0 | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU225967 | 28.01.2008 | B1 | HUT75089 | 28.04.1997 | A | HU9303282D0 | 28.03.1994 | D0 | Priority number | Date | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU227067 | 28.06.2010 | B1 | HUT73637 | 28.08.1996 | A | HU9500857D0 | 29.05.1995 | D0 | Priority number | Date | CA9300388 | 22.09.1993 | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUT75868 | 28.05.1997 | A | HU9602965D0 | 28.01.1997 | D0 | Priority number | Date | CA2122519 | 29.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUT76846 | 29.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2131130 | 30.08.1994 | CA2145605 | 27.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL95745 | 22.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | IL9574590 | 19.09.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN175918 | 28.10.1995 | B | Priority number | Date | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN178280 | 22.03.1997 | B | Priority number | Date | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN179130 | 30.08.1997 | B | Priority number | Date | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN181288 | 02.05.1998 | B | Priority number | Date | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | IN554CA1993 | IN669CA1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN181289 | 02.05.1998 | B | Priority number | Date | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN182267 | 27.02.1999 | B | Priority number | Date | IN270CA1995 | IN94CA1993 | 16.02.1993 | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN182348 | 27.03.1999 | B | Priority number | Date | IN271CA1995 | IN94CA1993 | 16.02.1993 | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN182376 | 03.04.1999 | B | Priority number | Date | IN671CA1995 | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | IN554CA1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100315371B | 20.06.2002 | B1 | KR950700086 | 16.01.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100334973B | 12.10.2002 | B1 | KR950700085 | 16.01.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR920700697 | 10.08.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | CA9000306 | 18.09.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR970702728 | 10.06.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | CA9500259 | 28.04.1995 | CA2122519 | 29.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR970705401 | 09.10.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2131130 | 30.08.1994 | CA9500477 | 11.08.1995 | CA2145605 | 27.03.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MD960294 | 31.10.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | CA9300388 | 22.09.1993 | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MD960307 | 31.10.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | CA9300061 | 16.02.1993 | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9300904 | 01.10.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9300905 | 01.10.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9305887 | 31.05.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO309457B | 05.02.2001 | B1 | NO951122L | 23.03.1995 | L | NO951122D0 | 23.03.1995 | D0 | Priority number | Date | CA9300388 | 22.09.1993 | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO312939B | 22.07.2002 | B1 | NO943044L | 19.10.1994 | L | NO943044D0 | 17.08.1994 | D0 | Priority number | Date | CA9300061 | 16.02.1993 | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO911952L | 05.07.1991 | L | NO911952D0 | 21.05.1991 | D0 | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | CA9000306 | 18.09.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ249071 | 29.01.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ249072 | 28.10.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ255978 | 24.02.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ299280 | 22.12.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ299281 | 22.12.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ299942 | 25.05.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | CA9300388 | 22.09.1993 | NZ25597893 | 22.09.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ335259 | 22.12.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ33525996 | 18.10.1996 | CA9600700 | 18.10.1996 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL173211B | 27.02.1998 | B1 | Priority number | Date | CA9300061 | 16.02.1993 | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL308201 | 24.07.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA9300388 | 22.09.1993 | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT626863E | 30.08.2001 | E | Priority number | Date | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT626864E | 28.11.2003 | E | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RO112812 | 30.01.1998 | B1 | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | CA9000306 | 18.09.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RO117499 | 30.04.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | CA9300061 | 16.02.1993 | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2146139 | 10.03.2000 | C1 | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | CA9000306 | 18.09.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2162327 | 27.01.2001 | C2 | Priority number | Date | CA2122519 | 29.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG48845 | 18.05.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG49874 | 15.06.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG52416 | 28.09.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK11093 | 09.09.1993 | A3 | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | CA9300062 | 16.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK11193 | 09.09.1993 | A3 | Priority number | Date | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK137996 | 05.08.1998 | A3 | Priority number | Date | CA9500259 | 28.04.1995 | CA2122519 | 29.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK36895 | 05.03.1997 | A3 | Priority number | Date | CA9300388 | 22.09.1993 | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW271401B | 01.03.1996 | B | Priority number | Date | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6852708 | 08.02.2005 | B2 | US2002077314 | 20.06.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83867492 | 21.02.1992 | US44850395 | 26.07.1995 | US28576494 | 03.08.1994 | US99647097 | 22.12.1997 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | US12539893 | 23.09.1993 | US95209592 | 28.09.1992 | US83867592 | 21.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003036525 | 20.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23435502 | 04.09.2002 | CA9600700 | 18.10.1996 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | US86069697 | 16.06.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5614506 | 25.03.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US83867492 | 21.02.1992 | US28576494 | 03.08.1994 | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | US95209592 | 28.09.1992 | US83867592 | 21.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5639738 | 17.06.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | US83867592 | 21.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5792753 | 11.08.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | US1850893 | 17.02.1993 | US83867592 | 21.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5811410 | 22.09.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | US46533595 | 05.06.1995 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5817642 | 06.10.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US46476995 | 15.08.1995 | CA2122551 | 29.04.1994 | CA9500243 | 27.04.1995 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5817644 | 06.10.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US56848995 | 07.12.1995 | US46832895 | 06.06.1995 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | US52059195 | 30.08.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5824658 | 20.10.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | US29084894 | 19.08.1994 | CA9000306 | 18.09.1990 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | US46832995 | 07.08.1995 | US83867592 | 21.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5827834 | 27.10.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | US28626394 | 05.08.1994 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5830882 | 03.11.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | US46261595 | 05.06.1995 | CA9000306 | 18.09.1990 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5834444 | 10.11.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US83867492 | 21.02.1992 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | US12539893 | 23.09.1993 | US95209592 | 28.09.1992 | US83867592 | 21.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5852002 | 22.12.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | US46214795 | 05.06.1995 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5910489 | 08.06.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | US29084894 | 19.08.1994 | CA9300062 | 16.02.1993 | CA9000306 | 18.09.1990 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | US83867592 | 21.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5914322 | 22.06.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | US46677495 | 06.06.1995 | US83867592 | 21.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5942498 | 24.08.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US83867492 | 21.02.1992 | US46717195 | 06.06.1995 | US29084094 | 27.10.1994 | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5962433 | 05.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | US29084894 | 19.08.1994 | US46677895 | 06.06.1995 | CA9000306 | 18.09.1990 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | US83867592 | 21.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5972906 | 26.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US83867492 | 21.02.1992 | US50391995 | 19.07.1995 | US29084894 | 19.08.1994 | US1875493 | 17.02.1993 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | US29084094 | 27.10.1994 | US1850893 | 17.02.1993 | US83867592 | 21.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5977088 | 02.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US83867492 | 21.02.1992 | US46799595 | 06.06.1995 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | US29084094 | 27.10.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5990095 | 23.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US83867492 | 21.02.1992 | CA9400188 | 25.03.1994 | US44850395 | 26.07.1995 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | US12539893 | 23.09.1993 | US95209592 | 28.09.1992 | US83867592 | 21.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5990096 | 23.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US83867492 | 21.02.1992 | US67590890 | 18.09.1990 | US29084094 | 27.10.1994 | US46671395 | 06.06.1995 | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6017900 | 25.01.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | US29084894 | 19.08.1994 | US46677595 | 06.06.1995 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | US83867592 | 21.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6022866 | 08.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | CA9300388 | 22.09.1993 | US28576494 | 03.08.1994 | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | US40376695 | 24.03.1995 | US95209592 | 28.09.1992 | US83867592 | 21.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6069135 | 30.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | CA9000306 | 18.09.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6087344 | 11.07.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US47473295 | 07.06.1995 | US29084894 | 19.08.1994 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6103704 | 15.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US1875493 | 17.02.1993 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | US83867592 | 21.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6114314 | 05.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US83867492 | 21.02.1992 | US35269794 | 01.12.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6136793 | 24.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US46671595 | 06.06.1995 | US29084094 | 27.10.1994 | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6140312 | 31.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6147059 | 14.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US83867492 | 21.02.1992 | US46833095 | 06.06.1995 | US29084094 | 27.10.1994 | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6194392 | 27.02.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | US46097895 | 07.08.1995 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6218373 | 17.04.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US83867492 | 21.02.1992 | US46799495 | 06.06.1995 | US29084094 | 27.10.1994 | CA2061703 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6475795 | 05.11.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | CA9600700 | 18.10.1996 | US67590891 | 03.07.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA931174 | 16.09.1993 | B | Priority number | Date | CA2061566 | 20.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA937068 | 18.04.1994 | B | Priority number | Date | CA2079205 | 25.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA957223 | 01.04.1996 | B | Priority number | Date | CA2131130 | 30.08.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9104058 | Global Dossier | 19.09.1991 | A3 | WO9104058 | 04.04.1991 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1485097 | Global Dossier | 22.05.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AP175 | 03.04.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE131068T | 15.12.1995 | T1 | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE227587T | 15.11.2002 | T1 | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1340994 | 16.05.2000 | C | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2042034 | 22.03.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1101228C | 12.02.2003 | C | CN1051503 | 22.05.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69034018T | 24.07.2003 | T2 | DE69034018D1 | 19.12.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0656213T | 17.03.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2080837T | 01.03.2002 | T5 | ES2080837T | 16.02.1996 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2186693T | 16.05.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1005985 | 05.02.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU211953A9 | 29.01.1996 | A9 | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU220758 | 28.05.2002 | B1 | HUT64699 | 28.02.1994 | A | HU907339D0 | 28.08.1991 | D0 | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN171745 | 26.12.1992 | B | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3256761B | 12.02.2002 | B2 | JPH04504579 | 13.08.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT3545 | 27.11.1995 | B | LTIP1582 | 26.06.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG49658 | 15.06.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK459890 | 12.09.2000 | A3 | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5914314 | 22.06.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5929048 | 27.07.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5932560 | 03.08.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5985850 | 16.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5985851 | 16.11.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6048844 | 11.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA907564 | 28.08.1991 | B | Priority number | Date | CA612307 | 21.09.1989 | Type | Divisional application | EP0656213 |