EP0512993 - BUS LOCKING FIFO MULTI-PROCESSOR COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.1996 [1996/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUSPEX SYSTEMS, INC. 2952 Bunker Hill Lane Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [1992/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PITTS, William, M. 780 Mora Drive Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 02 /
BLIGHTMAN, Stephen, E. 775 Salt Lake Drive San Jose, CA 95133 / US | 03 /
STARR, Daryl, D. 446 Folsom Court Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [1992/47] | Representative(s) | Barnard, Eric Edward, et al Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | Barnard, Eric Edward, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90914323.2 | 20.08.1990 | [1992/47] | WO1990US04697 | Priority number, date | US19900474350 | 02.02.1990 Original published format: US 474350 | [1992/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9111768 | Date: | 08.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0512993 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.08.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/38, G06F13/00 | [1992/47] | CPC: |
G06F13/4217 (EP);
G06F13/38 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/47] | Title | German: | BUS MIT VERRIEGELUNG FÜR DAS FIFO-MULTIPROZESSOR-NACHRICHTENSYSTEM | [1992/47] | English: | BUS LOCKING FIFO MULTI-PROCESSOR COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [1992/47] | French: | BUS BLOQUANT LE SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION D'UN MULTIPROCESSEUR FONTIONNANT EN FIFO | [1992/47] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.1992 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.1992 | Search fee paid | 20.07.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 21.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/47] | 19.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/23] | 09.01.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1995 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0064818 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) | [A] - PROC. EUROPEAN COMPUTER GRAPHICS CONF., September 1989, HAMBURG, DE; pages 197 - 208 M. POTMESIL ET AL 'A Parallel Image Computer with a Distributed Frame Buffer: System Architecture and Programming' | International search | [X]US4062059 (SUZUKI SEIGO, et al); | [X]US4285038 (SUZUKI SEIGO, et al); | [X]US4423482 (HARGROVE ARTHUR K [US], et al) |