EP0495819 - IMPROVEMENTS TO OIL/WATER MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGAR CORPORATION INCORPORATED 1600 Townhurst, PO Box 802127 Houston, Texas / US | [1996/34] |
Former [1992/31] | For all designated states AGAR, Joram 18 Islands Club P.O. Box 1764 Grand Cayman Cayman Islands / KY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Agar, Joram 18 Island Club, P.O. Box 1764 Grand Cayman / KY | [1996/34] |
Former [1992/31] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/31] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90914755.5 | 04.10.1990 | [1992/31] | WO1990GB01529 | Priority number, date | US19890417658 | 04.10.1989 Original published format: US 417658 | [1992/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9105243 | Date: | 18.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0495819 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0495819 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N22/00 | [1992/31] | CPC: |
G01N22/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/31] | Title | German: | ÖL-/WASSERMESSUNG | [1992/31] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS TO OIL/WATER MEASUREMENT | [1992/31] | French: | AMELIORATIONS APPORTEES AU MESURAG D'HUILE/EAU | [1992/31] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.1992 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/31] | 14.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 02.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.1999 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP99201984.4 / EP0962761 | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.01.2000 | BE | 05.01.2000 | CH | 05.01.2000 | ES | 05.01.2000 | LI | 05.01.2000 | SE | 05.01.2000 | DK | 05.04.2000 | DE | 06.04.2000 | LU | 04.10.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
CH | 05.01.2000 | ||
ES | 05.01.2000 | ||
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
DK | 05.04.2000 | ||
DE | 06.04.2000 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
CH | 05.01.2000 | ||
ES | 05.01.2000 | ||
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
DE | 06.04.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
CH | 05.01.2000 | ||
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
DE | 06.04.2000 | ||
Former [2002/11] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
CH | 05.01.2000 | ||
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
DE | 06.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 05.01.2000 | |
BE | 05.01.2000 | ||
CH | 05.01.2000 | ||
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 05.01.2000 | |
LI | 05.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | CH | 10.04.2000 | |
LI | 10.04.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP52139464 ; | US3498112 [ ] (HOWARD DEAN D); | US4257708 [ ] (FUKUDA NORISUKE); | US4423623 [ ] (HO WILLIAM W [US], et al); | US4503383 [ ] (AGAR JORAM [KY], et al); | US4764718 [ ] (REVUS DAVID E [US], et al); | US4774680 [ ] (AGAR JORAM [KY]) | [A] - Patent Abstracts of Japan, vol. 2, no. 20, page 11346E77, 9 February 1978; & JP-A-52139464 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI) 21 November 1977, & JP52139464 A 19771121 | [A] - Review of Scientific Instruments, vol. 50, no. 10, October 1979 American Institute of Physics (US) N. Abuaf et al.: "Radio-frequency probe for bubble size and velocity measurements", pages 1260-1262 |